EP0787645 - Gear shifting mechanism [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.06.2002 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.06.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.08.2002 [2002/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SHIMANO INC. 77, Oimatsucho 3-cho Sakai-shi Osaka / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1997/32] | For all designated states SHIMANO INC. 77, Oimatsucho 3-cho Sakai-shi Osaka / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kirimoto, Kanji 1-22-6 Kashin Kaizuka-shi, Osaka / JP | 02 /
Oka, Mitsuo 2090-4 Fukaishimizu-cho Sakai-shi, Osaka / JP | [1997/32] | Representative(s) | Pacitti, Pierpaolo Alfonso, et al Murgitroyd and Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/32] | Pacitti, Pierpaolo A.M.E., et al Murgitroyd and Company 373 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8QA / GB | Application number, filing date | 97300494.8 | 27.01.1997 | [1997/32] | Priority number, date | US19960595540 | 02.02.1996 Original published format: US 595540 | [1997/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0787645 | Date: | 06.08.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/32] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0787645 | Date: | 20.08.1997 | [1997/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0787645 | Date: | 16.08.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.07.1997 | Classification | IPC: | B62M25/04, B62K23/06 | [1997/34] | CPC: |
B62M25/04 (EP,US);
F16H63/38 (EP,US);
Y10T74/20085 (EP,US);
Y10T74/20287 (EP,US);
Y10T74/20438 (EP,US);
Y10T74/20636 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1997/32] | B62M25/04 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT [1997/32] | Title | German: | Gangschaltung | [1997/32] | English: | Gear shifting mechanism | [1997/32] | French: | Dispositif de changement de vitesse | [1997/32] | Examination procedure | 10.02.1997 | Examination requested [1997/32] | 13.01.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.05.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.09.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.03.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.12.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.02.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.04.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 17.04.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.05.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]FR2540818 (SHIMANO INDUSTRIAL CO [JP]) [Y] 1-8 * figure -; claim - *; | [Y]EP0669250 (SHIMANO KK [JP]) [Y] 1-8 * column 4, line 3 - column 6, line 34; figures 1-3 * |