EP0787982 - Liquid sampling [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.10.1998 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.10.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.12.1998 [1998/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MONTEC INTERNATIONAL LIMITED Pacific Way, Salford Manchester M5 2DL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/32] | For all designated states Montec International Limited Pacific Way, Salford Manchester M5 2DL / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kostanzer, Gerhard Im Oberdorf 23 72379 Hechingen / DE | 02 /
Wehrstein, Hartmut Hühlberg 29 72116 Mössingen / DE | [1997/32] | Representative(s) | Every, David Aidan, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 1 New York Street Manchester, M1 4HD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/32] | Every, David Aidan, et al MARKS & CLERK, Sussex House, 83-85 Mosley Street Manchester M2 3LG / GB | Application number, filing date | 97300616.6 | 30.01.1997 | [1997/32] | Priority number, date | GB19960002278 | 03.02.1996 Original published format: GB 9602278 | [1997/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0787982 | Date: | 06.08.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.10.1998 | Classification | IPC: | G01N1/14 | [1997/32] | CPC: |
G01N1/14 (EP);
G01N2001/1043 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1997/32] | Title | German: | Flüssigkeitsprobenentnahme | [1997/32] | English: | Liquid sampling | [1997/32] | French: | Echantillonage de liquide | [1997/32] | Examination procedure | 07.02.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1998/51] | 09.07.1998 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1998/51] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9105234 (JONES RICHARD W) [A] 1-10 * page 7 - page 10; figure 3 *; | [A]EP0502564 (OXFORD GLYCOSYSTEMS LTD) [A] 1,6 * column 2, line 35 - column 3, line 6 *; | [A]US3795347 (SINGER E) [A] 1-10 * column 1, line 34 - line 62 * * column 5, line 5 - line 47; figure - *; | [A]US4037472 (GATES WENDALL C) [A] 1-10 * column 4, line 17 - column 6, line 10; figure - *; | [A]US4574849 (FUKUDA MASAO) |