EP0787590 - Printing method and apparatus therefor and printing system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.10.2004 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.10.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.11.2004 [2004/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1997/32] | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ogata, Nobuhiko Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | [1997/32] | Representative(s) | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al Beresford Crump LLP 16 High Holborn London WC1V 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/32] | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al BERESFORD & Co. 2-5 Warwick Court High Holborn London WC1R 5DJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 97300680.2 | 04.02.1997 | [1997/32] | Priority number, date | JP19960018814 | 05.02.1996 Original published format: JP 1881496 | [1997/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0787590 | Date: | 06.08.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/32] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0787590 | Date: | 14.10.1998 | [1998/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0787590 | Date: | 03.12.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.08.1998 | Classification | IPC: | B41J2/05, G06K15/10, B41J2/205, B41J2/21 | [1998/17] | CPC: |
G06K15/105 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1997/32] | B41J2/05 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1997/32] | Title | German: | Druckverfahren, Vorrichtung dafür und Drucksystem | [1997/32] | English: | Printing method and apparatus therefor and printing system | [1997/32] | French: | Méthode d'impression, dispositif assiocié et système d'impression | [1997/32] | Examination procedure | 26.02.1999 | Examination requested [1999/17] | 19.09.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.07.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.09.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.05.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 18.06.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 18.06.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.09.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/48] | Request for further processing for: | 02.07.2003 | Request for further processing filed | 02.07.2003 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 16.07.2003 | Decision despatched | 17.07.2002 | Request for further processing filed | 17.07.2002 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 13.08.2002 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAY]EP0526205 (CANON KK [JP]) [X] 1-10,12,15-18,20 * column 4, line 56 - column 5, line 34 * * column 14, line 4 - line 27; figure 9; claims 1,3,5,31 * [A] 11,14,19,22 [Y] 13,21; | [XA]EP0597714 (CANON KK [JP]) [X] 1,6,7,11,19 * claim 9 * [A] 8-10; | [XA]EP0532302 (CANON KK [JP]) [X] 12,20 * page 3, line 31 - page 4, line 5 * * page 6, line 17 - line 32 * * page 13, line 17 - line 27 * * figures 2A,2B * [A] 1; | [A]EP0517543 (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 1,8 * column 12, line 40 - line 49 *; | [A]JPH0531919 ; | [Y]JPH0428553 ; | [A]EP0645246 (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 1,6-8 * column 3, line 47 - column 4, line 9; figures 3A,3B *; | [A]EP0606022 (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 2,16 * column 24, line 51 - column 25, line 36; figure 31 *; | [A]EP0665112 (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 12,13,20,21 * claims 1,2,4 *; | [A]EP0665105 (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 13,14,21,22 * claims 1,2 *; | [A]EP0645245 (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 13,14,21,22 * page 2, line 44 - line 51 * * page 3, line 8 - line 11 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930616), vol. 17, no. 316, Database accession no. (M - 1430), & JP05031919 A 19930209 (CANON INC) [A] 1,4-10,11,19 * abstract * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920512), vol. 16, no. 195, Database accession no. (M - 1246), & JP04028553 A 19920131 (CANON INC) [Y] 13,21 * abstract * | by applicant | US4723129 | US4740796 | US4463359 | US4345262 | US4313124 | US4558333 | US4459600 | JPS59123670 | JPS59138461 | JPS5456847 | JPS6071260 |