EP0788805 - Control for CPAP apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.10.1999 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.10.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.11.1999 [1999/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DEVILBISS HEALTH CARE, INC. 1200 East Main Street, P.O. Box 635 Somerset Pennsylvania 15501-0635 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1997/33] | For all designated states DeVilbiss Health Care, Inc. 1200 East Main Street, P.O. Box 635 Somerset, Pennsylvania 15501-0635 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Froehlich, James P. RD No. 4, Box 145 Berlin, Pennsylvania 15530 / US | 02 /
Mitchell, Joseph N. RD No. 3, Box 88 Rockwood, Pennsylvania 15547 / US | 03 /
Jones, Stephen M. 608 George Street Turtle Creek, Pennsylvania 15145 / US | [1997/33] | Representative(s) | Waldren, Robin Michael, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/33] | Waldren, Robin Michael, et al MARKS & CLERK, 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields London WC2A 3LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 97300762.8 | 06.02.1997 | [1997/33] | Priority number, date | US19960597222 | 06.02.1996 Original published format: US 597222 | [1997/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0788805 | Date: | 13.08.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/33] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0788805 | Date: | 13.05.1998 | [1998/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.03.1998 | Classification | IPC: | A61M16/00 | [1997/33] | CPC: |
A61M16/0051 (EP);
A61M16/0069 (EP);
A61M16/024 (EP);
A61M16/0677 (EP);
A61M2016/0021 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1997/33] | Title | German: | Steuerung einer Vorrichtung zur Aufrechthaltung eines kontinuierlichen positiven Atemwegdrucks | [1997/33] | English: | Control for CPAP apparatus | [1997/33] | French: | Circuit de commande pour appareil à ventilation spontanée en pression positive continue | [1997/33] | Examination procedure | 14.11.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1999/47] | 25.05.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1999/47] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 20.01.1999 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.1999 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9324169 (COTNER RONALD L [US], et al); | [A]EP0661071 (RESCARE LTD [AU]); | [A]US5245995 (SULLIVAN COLIN E [AU], et al); | [AP]EP0722747 (DEVILBISS HEALTH CARE INC [US]); | [AP]US5503146 (FROEHLICH JAMES P [US], et al); | [AP]WO9611717 (BIRD PRODUCTS CORP [US]) |