EP0789349 - Pattern matching method and apparatus thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1997/33] | Pattern matching method and apparatus and telephone system | ||
[2001/15] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.07.2003 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.07.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.08.2003 [2003/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1997/33] | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tzirkel-Hancock, Eli, Canon Res. Centre Europe Ltd 20 Alan Turing Road,Surrey Research Park Guildford, Surrey GU2 5YF / GB | 02 /
Keiller, Robert, Alexander;Canon Res. Centre Europe 20 Alan Turing Road,Surrey Research Park Guildford, Surrey GU2 5YF / GB | [1998/36] |
Former [1997/33] | 01 /
Tzirkel-Hancock, Eli, Canon Res. Centre Europe Ltd 20 Alan Turing Road,Surrey Research Park Guildford, Surrey GU2 5YF / GB | ||
02 /
Keiller, Alexander, Canon Res. Centre Europe Ltd. 20 Alan Turing Road,Surrey Research Park Guildford, Surrey GU2 5YF / GB | Representative(s) | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al Beresford Crump LLP 16 High Holborn London WC1V 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/33] | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al BERESFORD & Co. 2-5 Warwick Court High Holborn London WC1R 5DJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 97300814.7 | 07.02.1997 | [1997/33] | Priority number, date | GB19960002699 | 09.02.1996 Original published format: GB 9602699 | GB19960014429 | 09.07.1996 Original published format: GB 9614429 | [1997/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0789349 | Date: | 13.08.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/33] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0789349 | Date: | 12.11.1997 | [1997/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0789349 | Date: | 28.08.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.09.1997 | Classification | IPC: | G10L15/12, H04M3/42, H04M3/50, H04Q3/62, H04Q3/42 | [2001/15] | CPC: |
H04M3/533 (EP,US);
G10L15/12 (EP,US);
H04M3/42204 (EP,US);
G10L2015/085 (EP,US);
H04M1/271 (EP,US);
H04M1/57 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [1997/33] | G10L5/06, H04M3/42, H04M3/50, H04Q3/62, H04Q3/42 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1997/33] | Title | German: | Mustervergleichsverfahren und Vorrichtung dafür | [2001/15] | English: | Pattern matching method and apparatus thereof | [2001/15] | French: | Méthode de comparaison de formes et appareil correspondant | [2001/15] |
Former [1997/33] | Mustervergleichsverfahren und Gerät und Fernsprechsystem | ||
Former [1997/33] | Pattern matching method and apparatus and telephone system | ||
Former [1997/33] | Méthode de comparaison de formes et appareil et système téléphonique | Examination procedure | 26.02.1997 | Examination requested [1997/33] | 12.11.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.05.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.04.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 29.11.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination {1} | 06.03.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.05.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 16.05.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP02075354.7 / EP1213707 | Opposition(s) | 30.05.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/34] | Request for further processing for: | 05.02.2002 | Request for further processing filed | 05.02.2002 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 06.03.2002 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO8704290 (MOTOROLA INC [US]) [A] 1 * page 56, line 22 - page 57, line 13 * * page 55, line 16 - page 56, line 18 * * page 62, line 15 - line 29 *; | [A]US4910783 (NAKAGAWA SEIICHI [JP]) [A] 1* column 13, line 35 - column 14, line 33 *; | [A]EP0417854 (PHILIPS PATENTVERWALTUNG [DE], et al) [A] 1 * column 7, line 10 - column 10, line 12 *; | [A]US5218668 (HIGGINS ALAN L [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 8 - column 9 * | by applicant | US4592086 |