EP0790163 - Half scissor jack structure [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.11.2002 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.11.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.01.2003 [2003/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VENTRA GROUP INC. 65 Industrial Road, P.O. Box 1170 Tottenham Ontario L0G 1W0 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [1997/34] | For all designated states VENTRA GROUP INC. 65 Industrial Road, P.O. Box 1170 Tottenham, Ontario L0G 1W0 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gill, Bryan D. 358 Bexhill Road Newmarket Ontario L3Y 6P7 / CA | [1997/34] | Representative(s) | Needle, Jacqueline Beck Greener Fulwood House 12 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/34] | Needle, Jacqueline W.H. BECK, GREENER & CO 7 Stone Buildings Lincoln's Inn London WC2A 3SZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 97300877.4 | 11.02.1997 | [1997/34] | Priority number, date | US19960600011 | 14.02.1996 Original published format: US 600011 | [1997/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0790163 | Date: | 20.08.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0790163 | Date: | 16.01.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.06.1997 | Classification | IPC: | B60S9/06 | [1997/34] | CPC: |
B66F3/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, GB [1997/34] | Title | German: | Halbscherenwagenheber | [1997/34] | English: | Half scissor jack structure | [1997/34] | French: | Cric à demi-ciseaux | [1997/34] | Examination procedure | 14.10.1997 | Examination requested [1997/50] | 05.03.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.08.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.08.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.02.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.03.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.07.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.10.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 15.10.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.10.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE4126085 (BERGISCHE ACHSEN KOTZ SOEHNE [DE]) [A] 1,3 * abstract *; | [A]US5348330 (FEW JEFFREY P [US], et al) [A] 1,3 * column 4, line 40 - line 44; figure 6 *; | [PA]US5501428 (GARCEAU BERNARD F [US]) [PA] 1,3 * column 5, line 12 - line 18; figure 1 * |