EP0793233 - Information record medium, apparatus for recording the same and apparatus for reproducing the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.02.2011 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.02.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.03.2011 [2011/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PIONEER ELECTRONIC CORPORATION 1-1, Shin-ogura Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 212-0031 / JP | [2011/01] |
Former [2010/15] | For all designated states PIONEER ELECTRONIC CORPORATION No. 4-1, Meguro 1-chome Meguro-ku Tokyo-to / JP | ||
Former [1997/36] | For all designated states PIONEER ELECTRONIC CORPORATION No. 4-1, Meguro 1-chome Meguro-ku Tokyo-to / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tozaki, Akihiro, c/o Pioneer Electronic Corp. Sougou Kenkyusho, No. 6-1-1 Fujimi Tsurugashima-shi, Saitama-ken / JP | 02 /
Takahashi, Tokihiro, c/o Pioneer Electronic Corp. Tokorozawa Works, No. 2610 Hanazono 4-chome Tokorozawa-shi, Saitama-ken / JP | 03 /
Ishii, Hidehiro, c/o Pioneer Electronic Corp. Tokorozawa Works, No. 2610 Hanazono 4-chome Tokorozawa-shi, Saitama-ken / JP | 04 /
Yoshio, Junichi, c/o Pioneer Electronic Corp. Tokorozawa Works, No. 2610 Hanazono 4-chome Tokorozawa-shi, Saitama-ken / JP | 05 /
Nakamura, Hiroshi, c/o Pioneer Electronic Corp. Tokorozawa Works, No. 2610 Hanazone 4-chome Tokorozawa-shi, Saitama-ken / JP | 06 /
Sawabe, Takao, c/o Pioneer Electronic Corp. Head Office, No. 4-1 Meguro 1-chome, Meguro-ku Tokyo-to / JP | 07 /
Moriyama, Yoshiaki, c/o Pioneer Electronic Corp. Sougou Kenkyusho, No. 6-1-1 Fujimi Tsurugashima-shi, Saitama-ken / JP | 08 /
Yamamoto, Kaoru, c/o Pioneer Electronic Corp. Sougou Kenkyusho, No. 6-1-1 Fujimi Tsurugashima-shi, Saitama-ken / JP | [1997/36] | Representative(s) | Brunner, Michael John, et al Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/36] | Brunner, Michael John, et al GILL JENNINGS & EVERY Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 97301337.8 | 27.02.1997 | [1997/36] | Priority number, date | JP19960041943 | 28.02.1996 Original published format: JP 4194396 | [1997/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0793233 | Date: | 03.09.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/36] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0793233 | Date: | 16.09.1998 | [1998/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0793233 | Date: | 14.04.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.08.1998 | Classification | IPC: | G11B19/12, G11B19/247, G11B27/034, G11B27/10, G11B27/30, G11B20/12, G11B7/00, H04N5/926, H04N9/804, H04N5/85 | [1998/38] | CPC: |
G11B19/247 (EP,US);
G11B19/125 (EP,US);
G11B19/26 (EP,US);
G11B19/28 (EP,US);
G11B20/10527 (EP,US);
G11B20/1217 (EP,US);
G11B20/1251 (EP,US);
G11B27/034 (EP,US);
G11B27/105 (EP,US);
G11B27/3027 (EP,US);
G11B27/329 (EP,US);
G11B7/00736 (EP,US);
H04N9/8042 (EP,US);
G11B2020/10944 (EP,US);
G11B2020/1229 (EP,US);
G11B2020/1231 (EP,US);
G11B2020/1278 (EP,US);
G11B2220/2562 (EP,US);
G11B27/34 (EP,US);
G11B27/36 (EP,US);
G11B7/005 (EP,US);
H04N5/85 (EP,US);
H04N9/7921 (EP,US);
H04N9/8063 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [1997/36] | G11B27/10, G11B20/12, G11B20/10, G11B27/30, G11B7/00, H04N5/926, H04N9/804 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1997/36] | Title | German: | Informationsaufzeichnungsmedium, Gerät zur Aufzeichnung darauf und Gerät zur Wiedergabe davon | [1997/36] | English: | Information record medium, apparatus for recording the same and apparatus for reproducing the same | [1997/36] | French: | Milieu d'enregistrement d'information, appareil d'enregistrement de ceci et appareil de reproduction de ceci | [1997/36] | Examination procedure | 01.12.1998 | Examination requested [1999/05] | 09.12.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.06.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.01.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.07.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.06.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.12.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.10.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.02.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 03.02.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP06001814.0 / EP1650755 | Opposition(s) | 17.01.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 14.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 14.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 25.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 16.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 14 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0487294 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-4,7,8,10,13 * the whole document *; | [A]GB2215555 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [A] 1,2,6,7,9-12 * page 9, line 2 - page 32, line 3 *; | [A]NL8901491 (PHILIPS NV) [A] 1,4,6,7,10-12 * page 5, line 19 - line 29 * * page 10, line 1 - line 4 * * page 13, line 17 - line 37 * * page 6, line 13 - line 27 * * page 7, line 21 - page 8, line 20 *; | [A]EP0673034 (SONY CORP [JP]) [A] 1-4,7-14 * page 13, line 35 - line 43; figure 8 *; | [A]EP0695099 (PIONEER VIDEO CORP [JP], et al) [A] 1,2,6,7,9-11 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0689354 (PIONEER VIDEO CORP [JP], et al) [A] 1,2,7,10,11 * the whole document *; | [PA]EP0724264 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [PA] 1,2,5-7,9,10,15 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9512179 (TIME WARNER ENTERTAINM CO LP [US]) [A] 1,2,4,6,10,14 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0696798 (SONY CORP [JP]) [A] 1,2,6,7,9,10 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0685845 (TOSHIBA KK [JP], et al) [A] * the whole document * |