EP0862932 - Swimming goggle structure [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.09.2002 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.10.2002 [2002/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Chiang, Herman 11F-2, NO. 634-9 Ching-ping Road Chung-ho city Taipei Hsien / TW | [N/P] |
Former [2002/03] | For all designated states Chiang, Herman 11F-2, NO. 634-9 Ching-ping Road Chung-ho city, Taipei Hsien / TW | ||
Former [1998/37] | For all designated states Chiang, Herman 11F-2, NO. 634-9 Ching-ping Road Chung-ho city, Taipei Hsien / TW | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1998/37] | Representative(s) | Johnstone, Helen Margaret Urquhart-Dykes & Lord Tower House Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/37] | Johnstone, Helen Margaret Urquhart-Dykes & Lord Tower House Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | Application number, filing date | 97301387.3 | 03.03.1997 | [1998/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0862932 | Date: | 09.09.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.07.1997 | Classification | IPC: | A63B33/00 | [1998/37] | CPC: |
A63B33/004 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1999/21] |
Former [1998/37] | BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Schwimbrille | [1998/37] | English: | Swimming goggle structure | [1998/37] | French: | Masque de natation | [1998/37] | Examination procedure | 26.02.1999 | Examination requested [1999/17] | 05.12.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.04.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/43] | 21.05.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2002/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.1999 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   28.06.1999 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US5515551 (YASHIRO TOMOYUKI [JP]) [X] 1,4,5,8,16,19 * column 4, line 36 - line 63; figure - * * column 5, line 44 - line 54 * * column 6, line 12 - line 21 * * column 7, line 3 - line 11 * [Y] 9,10,12,14,15,19,20; | [Y]DE29606609U (CHIANG HERMAN [TW]) [Y] 9,10,12,14,15,19,20 * figure -; claims 1,13 *; | [A]US2568316 (EDWARD BROWN WILLIAM) [A] 1-3,12,13,16-18 * column 2, line 30 - column 4, line 5; figure - *; | [A]US5459882 (YAMAMOTO TAMENOBU [JP]) [A] 1-5,12,13,17,18 * figure -; claim 1 *; | [A]WO9535133 (SHARP PLASTICS MANUFACTURING L [CA], et al) [A] 1,9,12,16 * abstract * |