EP0796582 - Mat anchoring device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.05.2000 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.05.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.06.2000 [2000/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MILLIKEN DENMARK A/S Fabriksvej 8544 Mörke / DK | [1997/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lang, Aage Gronnevej 2 8560 Kolind / DK | [1997/39] | Representative(s) | Pattullo, Norman, et al Murgitroyd and Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/39] | Pattullo, Norman, et al Murgitroyd and Company 373 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8QA / GB | Application number, filing date | 97301957.3 | 21.03.1997 | [1997/39] | Priority number, date | GB19960005951 | 21.03.1996 Original published format: GB 9605951 | [1997/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0796582 | Date: | 24.09.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/39] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0796582 | Date: | 14.04.1999 | [1999/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.02.1999 | Classification | IPC: | A47G27/04 | [1997/39] | CPC: |
A47G27/0431 (EP);
A47G27/0418 (EP);
A47G27/0481 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, GB [1997/39] | Title | German: | Befestigungsvorrichtung für Teppichmatten | [1997/39] | English: | Mat anchoring device | [1997/39] | French: | Dispositif de fixation pour tapis | [1997/39] | Examination procedure | 01.10.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2000/26] | 12.10.1999 | Examination requested [1999/49] | 08.02.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2000/26] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.1999 | 03   M06   Not yet paid | 31.03.2000 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE2210676 (ALBER) [X] 1-9,12 * figures 7-12; claims 9-16 *; | [X]US4741065 (PARKINS) [X] 1,2,5-12 * the whole document *; | [X]DE343730 (BILSTEIN) [X] 1,2,5-12 * sentence 36 - sentence 44; figure - *; | [X]DE4218213 (WEITBRECHT ET AL.) [X] 1-4,12 * figure 2 *; | [X]US4901961 (GISH) [X] 1,2,5,6,12 * figure 9 * |