EP0798468 - Electric fan [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.03.2004 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 13.02.2008 [2008/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SANYO ELECTRIC CO., LTD. 5-5, Keihanhondori 2-chome Moriguchi-shi, Osaka 570 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1997/40] | For all designated states SANYO ELECTRIC Co., Ltd. 5-5, Keihanhondori 2-chome Moriguchi-shi, Osaka 570 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Iwatake, Makoto 3-110 Furusake, Hojo-cho Kasai-shi, Hyogo / JP | 02 /
Ochi, Hideki 150 Hojo, Hojo-cho Kasai-shi, Hyogo / JP | 03 /
Fujiwara, Yuji 695 Komiya, Harima-cho Kako-gun, Hyogo / JP | 04 /
Tsuchida, Hideya 150 Hojo, Hojo-cho Kasai-shi, Hyogo / JP | [1997/40] | Representative(s) | Pacitti, Pierpaolo Alfonso, et al Murgitroyd and Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/40] | Pacitti, Pierpaolo A.M.E., et al Murgitroyd and Company 373 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8QA / GB | Application number, filing date | 97302065.4 | 26.03.1997 | [1997/40] | Priority number, date | JP19960099542 | 29.03.1996 Original published format: JP 9954296 | JP19960099543 | 29.03.1996 Original published format: JP 9954396 | [1997/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0798468 | Date: | 01.10.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0798468 | Date: | 29.07.1998 | [1998/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0798468 | Date: | 14.05.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.06.1998 | Classification | IPC: | F04D29/66, F04D29/44, F04D17/16 | [1998/30] | CPC: |
F04D29/665 (EP,KR,US);
F04D29/441 (KR);
F04D29/4226 (KR)
|
Former IPC [1997/40] | F04D29/66 | Designated contracting states | DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1997/40] | Title | German: | Elektrischer Lüfter | [1997/40] | English: | Electric fan | [1997/40] | French: | Soufflante électrique | [1997/40] | Examination procedure | 20.11.1998 | Examination requested [1999/03] | 28.12.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.04.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.09.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.01.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 14.01.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.02.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 14.05.2003 | IT | 14.05.2003 | NL | 14.05.2003 | DK | 14.08.2003 | DE | 15.08.2003 | ES | 25.08.2003 | [2008/07] |
Former [2006/14] | FR | 14.05.2003 | |
NL | 14.05.2003 | ||
DK | 14.08.2003 | ||
DE | 15.08.2003 | ||
ES | 25.08.2003 | ||
Former [2004/23] | NL | 14.05.2003 | |
DK | 14.08.2003 | ||
DE | 15.08.2003 | ||
ES | 25.08.2003 | ||
Former [2004/03] | NL | 14.05.2003 | |
ES | 25.08.2003 | ||
Former [2004/02] | NL | 14.05.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2225398 (HAMBLIN CLYDE M) [A] 1,3,6,8 * column 1, line 38 - column 4, line 2; figures 1,2,5-8 *; | [A]US4131389 (PERRONE GEORGE L, et al) [A] 1,6 * column 4, line 16 - line 38; figures 1,2 *; | [A]GB2079853 (ONERA (OFF NAT AEROSPATIALE)) [A] 1,6 * page 3, line 6 - line 32; figures 7,8 *; | [A]DE1096536 (RHEINISCHE MASCHINEN UND APP G) [A] 1,6 * column 11, line 5 - line 56; figures 14,15 *; | [AD]JPS61207899 | [AD] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19870210), vol. 11, no. 44, Database accession no. (M - )<560> , & JP61207899 A 00000000 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND.) [AD] 1,6 * abstract * |