EP0797952 - System for assessing bone characteristics [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.05.2003 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.05.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.06.2003 [2003/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HOLOGIC, INC. 590 Lincoln Street Waltham, MA 02154 / US | [1997/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Weinstein, Joel B. 12 Kevin Circle Framington, Massachusetts 01701 / US | 02 /
Barry, Donald 379 Railroad Avenue Norwood, Massachusetts 02062 / US | [1997/40] | Representative(s) | Whitten, George Alan, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/40] | Whitten, George Alan, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co., 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 97302116.5 | 26.03.1997 | [1997/40] | Priority number, date | US19960622030 | 26.03.1996 Original published format: US 622030 | [1997/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0797952 | Date: | 01.10.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.08.1997 | Classification | IPC: | A61B8/08, A61B6/00 | [1997/40] | CPC: |
A61B6/505 (EP,US);
A61B8/0875 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1997/40] | Title | German: | System zur Erfassung der Knocheneigenschaften | [1997/40] | English: | System for assessing bone characteristics | [1997/40] | French: | Système pour déterminer les charactéristiques osseuses | [1997/40] | Examination procedure | 18.03.1998 | Examination requested [1998/20] | 09.08.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.12.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/26] | 27.01.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2003/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2003 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]WO9604554 (N D INST AUST PTY LIMITED SA [AU], et al) [Y] 1,2,5-7,13,16,17 * page 1, line 8 - page 3, line 27; figures 1-4; claim 14 * [A] 9,11,24,25; | [YA]EP0576217 (MCCUE ULTRASONICS LTD [GB]) [Y] 1,2,5-7 * the whole document * [A] 9,11; | [YA]EP0183524 (SYNTEX DIAGNOSTIC LTD [US]) [Y] 13,16,17 * the whole document * [A] 1-4,9-12,15,18,20-22; | [A]US5132097 (VAN DEUSEN RICHARD A [US], et al) [A] 1-4,9,11,13-15,18-22 * column 6, line 57 - column 7, line 39; figures 1-8 *; | [DA]US4811373 (STEIN JAY A [US]) [DA] 1,8 * column W *; | [A]US5062714 (PETERSON STEVEN H [US], et al) [A] 13,18,19,23 * column 3, line 43 - column 7, line 28; figures 1-20 * |