EP0803368 - System and method for determining presence of inks that are invisible to sensing devices [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.05.2003 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 08.10.2008 [2008/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2001/13] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company, A Delaware Corporation 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US | ||
Former [1997/44] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto, California 94304 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nelson, Gregory D. 1051 Nightingale Place Escondido, California 92027 / US | 02 /
Sievert, Otto K. 1457 North Vulcan Avenue, Apt. 7 Encinitas, California 92024-1542 / US | 03 /
Blanton, Robert D. 11242 Alejo Lane San Diego, California 92124 / US | [1997/44] | Representative(s) | Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/41] | Carpmaels & Ransford One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | ||
Former [2002/30] | Carpmaels & Ransford 43 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | ||
Former [1997/44] | Colgan, Stephen James, et al CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 97302597.6 | 16.04.1997 | [1997/44] | Priority number, date | US19960636439 | 22.04.1996 Original published format: US 636439 | [1997/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0803368 | Date: | 29.10.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0803368 | Date: | 17.07.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.08.1997 | Classification | IPC: | B41J2/21 | [1997/44] | CPC: |
B41J2/2114 (EP,US);
B41J2/2135 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1997/44] | Title | German: | System und Verfahren zur Bestimmung der Anwesenheit von Tinten die unsichtbar sind für optischen Fühler | [1997/44] | English: | System and method for determining presence of inks that are invisible to sensing devices | [1997/44] | French: | Système et méthode pour déterminer la présence d'encres invisibles aux dispositifs de détection | [1997/44] | Examination procedure | 03.04.1998 | Examination requested [1998/23] | 08.07.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.01.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.08.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.10.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.11.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.01.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.02.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 01.02.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.04.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]EP0622239 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [DA] 1,6 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0671275 (STORK COLORPROOFING [NL]) [A] 1,6 * column 5, line 11 - column 7, line 27; figure - * |