EP0806756 - Dymamic translucent windows in a graphical user interface [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.09.2000 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.09.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.10.2000 [2000/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation Armonk, NY 10504 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1997/46] | For all designated states INTERNATIONAL BUSINESS MACHINES CORPORATION Armonk, NY 10504 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bennett, Paul William 3700 Royal Port Rush Drive Round Rock, Texas 78664 / US | [1997/46] | Representative(s) | Ling, Christopher John IBM United Kingdom Limited Intellectual Property Department Hursley Park Winchester Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/46] | Ling, Christopher John IBM United Kingdom Limited, intellectual Property Department, Hursley Park Winchester, Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | Application number, filing date | 97302980.4 | 01.05.1997 | [1997/46] | Priority number, date | US19960647131 | 09.05.1996 Original published format: US 647131 | [1997/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0806756 | Date: | 12.11.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/46] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0806756 | Date: | 08.04.1998 | [1998/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0806756 | Date: | 10.11.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.02.1998 | Classification | IPC: | G09G5/14 | [1997/46] | CPC: |
G06F3/0481 (EP,US);
G09G5/14 (EP,US);
G06F2203/04804 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | FR, GB [1997/46] | Title | German: | Dynamische durchsichtige Fenster in einer graphischen Benutzerschnittstelle | [1997/46] | English: | Dymamic translucent windows in a graphical user interface | [1997/46] | French: | Fenêtres translucides dynamiques dans une interface d'utilisateur graphique | [1997/46] | Examination procedure | 07.10.1998 | Examination requested [1998/49] | 28.01.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.05.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.05.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 14.05.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.08.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0459711 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1,7 * column 4, line 31 - column 5, line 13 * * figures 4-7 *; | [A]EP0605945 (FIRSTPERSON INC [US]) [A] 1,7 * page 6, line 23 - line 51 * * figures 4A,4B *; | [A]EP0684542 (IBM [US]) [A] 1,7 * column 2, line 45 - column 3, line 35 ** figures 3-5 * |