EP0811734 - A roofing fastener [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.11.1999 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.12.1999 [1999/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Talfab Holdings Limited Blackpole Trading Estate Worcester WR3 8TJ / GB | [1997/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Taylor, Peter Beauty Bank Farmhouse, Six Ashes Bridgnorth, Shropshire WV15 6EP / GB | [1997/50] | Representative(s) | Tunstall, Christopher Stephen Harrison Goddard Foote Fountain Precinct Balm Green Sheffield S1 2JA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/03] | Tunstall, Christopher Stephen Dibb Lupton Alsop, Fountain Precinct Balm Green, Sheffield S1 1RZ / GB | ||
Former [1997/50] | Tunstall, Christopher Stephen Dibb Lupton Alsop, Fountain Precinct Balm Green, Sheffield S1 1RZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 97303226.1 | 12.05.1997 | [1997/50] | Priority number, date | GB19960009864 | 11.05.1996 Original published format: GB 9609864 | [1997/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0811734 | Date: | 10.12.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/50] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0811734 | Date: | 05.08.1998 | [1998/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.06.1998 | Classification | IPC: | E04D3/36, F16B19/14, F16B33/00 | [1997/50] | CPC: |
E04D3/3606 (EP);
F16B33/004 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR [1997/50] | Title | German: | Dachbefestigung | [1997/50] | English: | A roofing fastener | [1997/50] | French: | Fixation de toiture | [1997/50] | Examination procedure | 06.02.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1999/52] | 08.07.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1999/52] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 25.08.1997 | BE   M01   Fee paid on   11.09.1997 | 25.08.1997 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   11.09.1997 | 25.08.1997 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   11.09.1997 | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 01.04.1999 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.1999 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAY]DE2611395 (OPHEIS GMBH & CO) [X] 1-3,5 * the whole document * [A] 6,7,10 [Y] 4,6; | [YA]GB2159745 (SFS STADLER AG) [Y] 4 * page 1, line 5 - line 17 * * claim 2 * * figures 2,7,8,3,6 * [A] 1,10; | [Y]FR2623933 (THOMSON CSF) [Y] 6 * page 1, line 3 - line 6 * * page 5, line 24 - line 25 * * page 8, line 1 - line 12 *; | [A]US5295774 (ROBERTS DAVID) [A] 1,10 * column 1, line 42 - column 2, line 44 * * figures 1-6 *; | [A]US3869219 (WILSON ROBERT NEIL ET AL); | [A]US3803972 (DEUTSHER K) |