EP0808086 - High voltage ic-driven half-bridge gas discharge ballast [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.11.2002 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.11.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.01.2003 [2003/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1997/47] | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kachmarik, David Joseph 17890 Princeton Circle Strongsville, Ohio 44136 / US | 02 /
Nerone, Louis Robert 8058 Tanager Oval Brecksville, Ohio 44141 / US | [1997/47] | Representative(s) | Goode, Ian Roy London Patent Operation General Electric International, Inc. 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/47] | Goode, Ian Roy London Patent Operation General Electric International, Inc., Essex House, 12-13 Essex Street London WC2R 3AA / GB | Application number, filing date | 97303238.6 | 13.05.1997 | [1997/47] | Priority number, date | US19960648232 | 13.05.1996 Original published format: US 648232 | [1997/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0808086 | Date: | 19.11.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.09.1997 | Classification | IPC: | H05B41/29 | [1997/47] | CPC: |
H05B41/2828 (EP,US);
Y02B20/00 (EP,US);
Y10S315/05 (EP);
Y10S315/07 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1997/47] | Title | German: | Von einem Hochspannungs-IC gesteuertes Halbbrücken-Vorschaltgerät für Gasentladungslampen | [1997/47] | English: | High voltage ic-driven half-bridge gas discharge ballast | [1997/47] | French: | Ballast en demi-pont pour lampes à décharge, attaqué par un circuit intégré à haute tension | [1997/47] | Examination procedure | 19.05.1998 | Examination requested [1998/29] | 07.12.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.06.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/01] | 23.07.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2003/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0351012 (PHILIPS NV [NL]) [A] 1,4; | [A]EP0359860 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1,4; | [A]EP0439240 (SEMPERLUX GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,4 |