EP0817025 - Data structures and method for implementing subcontracts in a distributed object oriented system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.04.2010 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.04.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.06.2010 [2010/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SUN MICROSYSTEMS, INC. 4150 Network Circle Santa Clara, California 95054 / US | [2008/21] |
Former [1998/02] | For all designated states SUN MICROSYSTEMS, INC. 2500 Garcia Avenue Mountain View, California 94043-1100 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cavanaugh, Ken M., III 357 Fifth Street Montara, California 94043-1100 / US | 02 /
Snyder, Alan 4160 Briarwood Way Palo Alto, California 94043 / US | 03 /
Lim, Swee Boon 405 Stierlin Road, Apt. 50 Mountain View, California 94043 / US | 04 /
Callsen, Christian J. 744 Coleman Avenue, Apt. N Menlo Park, California 94025-2114 / US | [1998/02] | Representative(s) | Harris, Ian Richard, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Harris, Ian Richard, et al D Young & Co 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | ||
Former [2008/15] | Harris, Ian Richard, et al D Young & Co 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | ||
Former [2008/11] | Brown, George Laurence, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Tower North Central Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | ||
Former [1998/02] | Browne, Robin Forsythe, Dr. Urquhart-Dykes & Lord Tower House Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA West Yorkshire / GB | Application number, filing date | 97303292.3 | 14.05.1997 | [1998/02] | Priority number, date | US19960669782 | 26.06.1996 Original published format: US 669782 | [1998/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0817025 | Date: | 07.01.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/02] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0817025 | Date: | 12.11.2003 | [2003/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.10.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/44, G06F9/46 | [2003/46] | CPC: |
G06F9/548 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1998/02] | G06F9/46 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL, SE [1998/02] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Datenstrukturen zur Implementierung von Unterkontrakten in einem verteilten objektorientierten System | [1998/02] | English: | Data structures and method for implementing subcontracts in a distributed object oriented system | [1998/02] | French: | Structures de données et procédé pour implémenter des sous-contrats dans un système orienté objet distribué | [1998/02] | Examination procedure | 07.05.2004 | Examination requested [2004/28] | 04.11.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.04.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.12.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/22] | 13.01.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2010/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 10.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 14.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 14.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2009 | 13   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0695992 (SUN MICROSYSTEMS INC [US]) [A] 1,5,10,12,15,17,18,22,27,28 * abstract * * page 4, line 21 - line 39 * * page 5, line 34 - line 47 * * page 7, line 9 - line 56 * * page 9, line 14 - line 28 * * page 11, line 18 - page 12, line 16 *; | [A]EP0604010 (SUN MICROSYSTEMS INC [US]) [A] 1,5,10,12,15,17,18,22,27,28 * abstract * * page 4, line 9 - line 24 * * page 7, line 7 - page 8, line 3 * * page 9, line 1 - line 11 * * page 11, line 35 - page 12, line 25 * | [XAY] - ORFALI R., HARKEY D., "CLIENT/SERVER WITH DISTRIBUTED OBJECTS", BYTE, MCGRAW-HILL INC. ST PETERBOROUGH, US, (19950401), vol. 20, no. 4, ISSN 0360-5280, pages 151 - 152,154,156, XP000501827 [X] 5,22,28 * abstract * * page 156, column R, line 1 - line L * * page 159, column L, line 1 - column R, line 7 * [A] 1,10,12,15,17,18,27 [Y] 6,23 | [DYA] - HAMILTON G., POWELL M. L., MITCHELL J. G., "SUBCONTRACT: A FLEXIBLE BASE FOR DISTRIBUTED PROGRAMMING", OPERATING SYSTEMS REVIEW (SIGOPS), US, ACM HEADQUARTER, NEW YORK, (19931201), vol. 27, no. 5, pages 69 - 79, XP000418684 [DY] 6,23 * abstract * * page 69, column R, line 27 - page 70, column L, line 2 * * page 70, column L, line 24 - line 32 * * page 71, column L, line 40 - column R, line 10 * * page 72, column L, line 31 - column R, line 6 * * page 72, column R, line 30 - page 73, column L, line 28 * * page 73, column R, line 8 - line 22 * * page 74, column L, line 32 - line 39 * * page 74, column R, line 15 - page 75, column L, line 31 * [A] 1,5,10,12,15,17,18,22,27,28 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/173668.168625 |