EP0807733 - Identification signal checking apparatus and methods [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 21.02.2003 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.02.2003 | Withdrawal of application | published on 09.04.2003 [2003/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 6-7-35 Kitashinagawa Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1997/47] | For all designated states SONY CORPORATION 6-7-35 Kitashinagawa Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Takamatsu, Hiroyuki, Sony Corp. Intell. Prop. Div. 6-7-35 Kitashinagawa, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | 02 /
Harada, Yoshio, Sony Corp. Intell. Prop. Div. 6-7-35 Kitashinagawa, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | [1997/47] | Representative(s) | Pilch, Adam John Michael, et al D Young & Co 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/47] | Pilch, Adam John Michael, et al D. YOUNG & CO., 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | Application number, filing date | 97303313.7 | 15.05.1997 | [1997/47] | Priority number, date | JP19960121869 | 16.05.1996 Original published format: JP 12186996 | JP19960243555 | 13.09.1996 Original published format: JP 24355596 | [1997/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0807733 | Date: | 19.11.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/47] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0807733 | Date: | 06.12.2000 | [2000/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.10.2000 | Classification | IPC: | E05B49/00 | [1997/47] | CPC: |
G07C9/00309 (EP,KR);
G07C2009/00396 (EP,KR);
G07C2009/00412 (EP,KR);
G07C2009/00785 (EP,KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1997/47] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Identifikationssignalprüfung | [1997/47] | English: | Identification signal checking apparatus and methods | [1997/47] | French: | Appareil et procédés de contrôle de signal d'identification | [1997/47] | Examination procedure | 04.05.2001 | Examination requested [2001/27] | 13.02.2003 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2003/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]GB2192665 (NEIMAN SECURITY PRODUCTS LIMIT) [Y] 1,2,5-7,10-12 * abstract * * page 2, line 9 - page 3, line 10 * * figures 1,4,5 *; | [Y]EP0484686 (IBM [US]) [Y] 1,2,5-7,10-12 * abstract * * column 4, line 11 - line 44 * * column 7, line 1 - column 8, line 49 * * figures 3,4 *; | [A]US4509093 (STELLBERGER KARL-HEINZ [DE]) [A] 1-4,6-9,11,12 * abstract * * column 6, line 30 - column 12, line 31 * * figures 2,3 *; | [A]US5355413 (OHNO HISASHI [JP]) [A] 1-4,6-9 * abstract * * column 1, line 47 - column 3, line 6 * * column 7, line 26 - column 8, line 11 * * figures 10,11 *; | [A]US5321753 (GRITTON DALE G [US]) [A] 1,2,6,7 * the whole document *; | [A]US4819267 (CARGILE WILLIAM P [US], et al) [A] 1,2,6,7 * abstract *; | [A]US5506575 (ORMOS ZOLTAN S [HU]) |