EP0807833 - Reflecting mirror and film and television receiver [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.05.2003 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.10.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 19.11.2008 [2008/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [2008/47] |
Former [2002/01] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571 / JP | ||
Former [1997/47] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Ohaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yamashita, Takehiko 1-5-3-1010, Tomobuchi-cho, Miyakojima-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 534 / JP | 02 /
Mitani, Katsuaki 1-17-5, Yamatedai Ibaraki-shi, Osaka 567 / JP | 03 /
Sakaguchi, Hirokazu 1-3-38-201, Shibahara-cho Toyonaka-shi, Osaka 560 / JP | [1997/47] | Representative(s) | Crawford, Andrew Birkby, et al A.A. Thornton & Co. 235 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/47] | Crawford, Andrew Birkby, et al A.A. THORNTON & CO. Northumberland House 303-306 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 97303344.2 | 16.05.1997 | [1997/47] | Priority number, date | JP19960122953 | 17.05.1996 Original published format: JP 12295396 | [1997/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0807833 | Date: | 19.11.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/47] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0807833 | Date: | 22.07.1998 | [1998/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0807833 | Date: | 24.07.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.06.1998 | Classification | IPC: | G02B5/08, H04N9/31 | [1997/47] | CPC: |
G02B5/0866 (EP,US);
B32B15/08 (KR);
H04N9/3141 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [1997/47] | Title | German: | Reflektierende Schicht, reflektierender Spiegel und Fernsehempfänger | [2001/49] | English: | Reflecting mirror and film and television receiver | [1997/47] | French: | Miroir et film réfléchissants et récepteur de télévision | [1997/47] |
Former [1997/47] | Reflektierende Schicht, reflektierender Spiegel ud Fernsehempfänger | Examination procedure | 07.09.1998 | Examination requested [1998/45] | 10.05.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.11.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.11.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.01.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.03.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 22.03.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.04.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5247395 (MARTINEZ EUGENE [US]) [A] 1,2,4-7,9,13-15 * column 1, line 57 - line 62; figures 1-4 * * column 3, line 2 - line 8 * * column 3, line 24 - line 26 * * column 3, line 55 - line 57; claim 9 *; | [A]JPS615986 ; | [A]WO9610596 (NIPPON ZEON CO [JP], et al) [A] 1,3,12 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19860531), vol. 010, no. 151, Database accession no. (M - 483), & JP61005986 A 19860111 (MITSUI TOATSU KAGAKU KK) [A] 1,3,12 * abstract * |