EP0810348 - Up-to-set lock mandrel and method of operation thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.05.2001 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.05.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.07.2001 [2001/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HALLIBURTON ENERGY SERVICES, INC. P.O. Box 819052 Dallas Texas 75381-9052 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1997/49] | For all designated states Halliburton Energy Services, Inc. P.O. Box 819052 Dallas, Texas 75381-9052 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dickson, Rennie L. 1726 San Franciso Street Carrollton, Texas 75007 / US | 02 /
Reesing, David L. 1304 Rusdell Irving, Texas 75060 / US | 03 /
Vinzant, Michael B. 1312 Yellowstone Lane Carrollton, Texas 75006 / US | [1997/49] | Representative(s) | Wain, Christopher Paul, et al A.A. Thornton & Co. 235 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/49] | Wain, Christopher Paul, et al A.A. THORNTON & CO. Northumberland House 303-306 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 97303345.9 | 16.05.1997 | [1997/49] | Priority number, date | US19960654944 | 29.05.1996 Original published format: US 654944 | [1997/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0810348 | Date: | 03.12.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/49] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0810348 | Date: | 09.08.2000 | [2000/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.06.2000 | Classification | IPC: | E21B23/02 | [1997/49] | CPC: |
E21B23/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1997/49] | Title | German: | Aufwärts setzbare Verriegelungshülse und Verfahren zu ihrer Bedienung | [1997/49] | English: | Up-to-set lock mandrel and method of operation thereof | [1997/49] | French: | Mandrin à verouillage par traction et procédé de son opération | [1997/49] | Examination procedure | 01.12.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2001/27] | 08.02.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2001/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2000 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3593784 (BROWN CICERO C ET AL) [X] 1-10 * column 3, line 41 - column 4, line 10; figures 1,2; claim 1 *; | [X]US3670815 (BROWN CICERO C) [X] 1-3,5-10 * column 2, line 40 - line 43 * * column 3, line 42 - line 75; figures 1-3 *; | [A]EP0701042 (HALLIBURTON CO) [A] 1,5,8 * column 18, line 53 - column 19, line 12 * * column 19, line 42 - line 55; figures 2A,2B; claim 7 *; | [A]US4896721 (WELCH WILLIAM R) [A] 1,5,8 * column 1, line 39 - line 48; figure 1 * |