EP0808824 - Process for preparing optically active 2-halogeno-3-hydroxypropionic acid ester [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.06.2000 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.06.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.08.2000 [2000/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TANABE SEIYAKU CO., LTD. 2-10, Dosho-machi 3-chome Chuo-ku Osaka / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1997/48] | For all designated states TANABE SEIYAKU CO., LTD. 2-10, Dosho-machi 3-chome Chuo-ku Osaka / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kuroda, Tooru No. 9-8-214, Asahigaoka-cho Ashiya-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP | 02 /
Yamanaka, Takeshi No. 2-23-12-5-3, Kisabeminami Katano-shi, Osaku-fu / JP | 03 /
Yamagishi, Masafumi No. 4-118-403, Showadori Amagasaki-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP | 04 /
Ozaki, Yasuhiko No. 18-18, Ishizuhigashi-machi Neyagawa-shi, Osaka-fu / JP | 05 /
Imashiro, Ritsuo No. 2-23-6 B-21, Kosobe-cho Takatsuki-shi, Osaka-fu / JP | [1997/48] | Representative(s) | Baverstock, Michael George Douglas, et al BOULT WADE TENNANT, Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/15] | Baverstock, Michael George Douglas, et al BOULT WADE TENNANT, 27 Furnival Street London EC4A 1PQ / GB | ||
Former [1997/48] | Hardisty, David Robert, et al BOULT WADE TENNANT, 27 Furnival Street London EC4A IPQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 97303508.2 | 22.05.1997 | [1997/48] | Priority number, date | JP19960128878 | 24.05.1996 Original published format: JP 12887896 | [1997/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0808824 | Date: | 26.11.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0808824 | Date: | 08.04.1998 | [1998/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.02.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C07C69/732, C07C67/475, C07C69/734, C07C69/675, C07D303/48, C07D281/10 | [1997/48] | CPC: |
C07D317/20 (EP);
C07C67/475 (EP);
C07C69/732 (EP);
C07C69/734 (EP);
C07D281/10 (EP);
C07D301/24 (EP);
C07D303/48 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C07C67/475, C07C69/732 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FI, FR, GB, IT, NL [1997/48] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von optisch aktiven Estern der 2-Halogen-3-Hydroxypropionsäure | [1997/48] | English: | Process for preparing optically active 2-halogeno-3-hydroxypropionic acid ester | [1997/48] | French: | Procédé de préparation d'esters de l'acide 2-halogéno-3-hydroxypropionique optiquement actif | [1997/48] | Examination procedure | 21.04.1998 | Examination requested [1998/25] | 05.08.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.02.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2000/32] | 14.03.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2000/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0409712 (SANOFI SA [FR]) [X] 8-13 * page 3, line 44 - page 4, line 48 * * page 5, line 32 - page 7, line 13 * * page 9 - page 12; examples 1-5 * * page 12 - page 15; claim - *; | [X]WO9413828 (CHIROSCIENCE LTD [GB], et al) [X] 8-13 * page 5, line 1 - line 26 * * page 9 - page 10 ** page 11 - page 12; claim - *; | [Y] - KOICHI MIKAMI ET AL., "Lanthanide(III) Catalyzed Aldol Reactions of Glyceraldehyde Acetonide with Ketene Silyl Acetals:Catalytic Asymmetric Route to Monosaccharides", TETRAHEDRON: ASYMMETRY., OXFORD GB, (1991), vol. 2, no. 10, pages 993 - 996, XP002054480 [Y] 1 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0957-4166(00)86145-5 | [PY] - KATSUHIKO ISEKI ET AL., "Isolation of alpha,alpha-Difluoroketene Silyl acetal and its Application to Asymmetric Aldol Reactions", TETRAHEDRON LETTERS., OXFORD GB, (19970224), vol. 38, no. 8, pages 1447 - 1448, XP002054481 [PY] 1 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0040-4039(97)00044-0 |