EP0810308 - An ultrafine a1 particle and production method thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 09.05.2002 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.05.2002 | Refusal of application | published on 26.06.2002 [2002/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Research Development Corporation of Japan 1-8 Hon-cho 4-chome Kawaguchi-shi Saitama-ken / JP | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa-ken 210-8520 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2000/03] | For all designated states RESEARCH DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION OF JAPAN 1-8 Hon-cho 4-chome Kawaguchi-shi, Saitama-ken / JP | ||
For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | |||
Former [1997/49] | For all designated states RESEARCH DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION OF JAPAN 1-8, Honcho 4-chome Kawaguchi-shi, Saitama-ken / JP | ||
For all designated states Tanaka, Shun-ichiro 1-35-12, Hongo, Seya-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tanaka, Shun-ichiro 1-35-12, Hongo, Seya-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagwa-ken / JP | 02 /
Xu, BingShe 102 Perute Kanazawabunko, 32-8, Shiba-cho Kanazawa-ku, Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | [1997/49] | Representative(s) | Waldren, Robin Michael, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/03] | Waldren, Robin Michael, et al MARKS & CLERK, 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields London WC2A 3LS / GB | ||
Former [1997/49] | Waldren, Robin Michael MARKS & CLERK, 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields London WC2A 3LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 97303596.7 | 27.05.1997 | [1997/49] | Priority number, date | JP19960131681 | 27.05.1996 Original published format: JP 13168196 | [1997/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0810308 | Date: | 03.12.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/49] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0810308 | Date: | 13.05.1998 | [1998/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.03.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C30B29/02, C30B23/02, C22C1/00, C23C14/28, C30B23/00 | [1998/20] | CPC: |
C23C14/30 (EP,US);
B22F9/30 (EP,US);
C23C14/14 (EP,US);
C30B23/002 (EP,US);
C30B23/02 (EP,US);
C30B29/02 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
B22F2999/00, B22F9/30, B22F2202/11 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1997/49] | C30B29/02, C30B23/02, C22C1/00, C23C14/28 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1997/49] | Title | German: | Ultrafeine Partikel aus Aluminium und Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung | [1997/49] | English: | An ultrafine a1 particle and production method thereof | [1997/49] | French: | Particule ultrafine et procédé de sa préparation | [1997/49] | Examination procedure | 06.06.1997 | Examination requested [1997/49] | 02.03.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.09.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.11.2001 | Date of oral proceedings | 24.01.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2002/26] | 24.01.2002 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 03.02.2002 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2002/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [PX]EP0735001 (JAPAN RES DEV CORP [JP], et al) [PX] 2-7 * claims 2-6 *; | [X] - XU ET AL., "Phase transformation and bonding of ceramic nanoparticles in a TEM", NANOSTRUCTURED MATERIALS, USA, (1995), vol. 6, pages 727 - 729, XP000671923 [X] 1,2 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0965-9773(95)00161-1 | [A] - HERLEY ET AL., "Ultra-fine particles of aluminium formed by electron-beam induced decomposition of aluminium hydride", MATERIALS LETTERS, AMSTERDAM NL, (198903), vol. 7, no. 12, pages 441 - 444, XP002030785 [A] 1,2 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0167-577X(89)90048-7 |