EP0811868 - Fabrication process of liquid crystal display apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1997/50] | Liquid crystal display apparatus and fabrication process thereof | ||
[2000/14] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.11.2002 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2006 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1997/50] | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Okita, Akira Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | [1997/50] | Representative(s) | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al Beresford Crump LLP 16 High Holborn London WC1V 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/50] | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al BERESFORD & Co. 2-5 Warwick Court High Holborn London WC1R 5DJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 97303720.3 | 02.06.1997 | [1997/50] | Priority number, date | JP19960162445 | 04.06.1996 Original published format: JP 16244596 | JP19970130683 | 21.05.1997 Original published format: JP 13068397 | [1997/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0811868 | Date: | 10.12.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0811868 | Date: | 02.01.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.10.1997 | Classification | IPC: | G02F1/136, H01L29/786 | [1997/50] | CPC: |
G02F1/13454 (EP,US);
H01L23/49894 (EP,US);
H01L27/12 (KR);
H01L29/78603 (EP,US);
H01L29/78675 (EP,US);
G02F2202/104 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/0002, H01L2924/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1998/34] |
Former [1997/50] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Herstellungsverfahren einer Flüssigkristallanzeigevorrichtung | [2000/14] | English: | Fabrication process of liquid crystal display apparatus | [2000/14] | French: | Procédé de fabrication d'un dispositif d'affichage à cristal liquide | [2000/14] |
Former [1997/50] | Flüssigkristallanzeigevorrichtung und deren Herstellungsverfahren | ||
Former [1997/50] | Liquid crystal display apparatus and fabrication process thereof | ||
Former [1997/50] | Dispositif d'affichage à cristal liquide et son procédé de fabrication | Examination procedure | 23.04.1998 | Examination requested [1998/26] | 11.06.1998 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 22.09.1998 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 16.07.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.01.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.02.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.07.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.09.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 17.09.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.10.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 08.07.1998 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 08.07.1998 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 08.07.1998 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 08.07.1998 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 08.07.1998 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 08.07.1998 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 08.07.1998 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 08.07.1998 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 08.07.1998 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 08.07.1998 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 08.07.1998 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 08.07.1998 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 08.07.1998 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 08.07.1998 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 02.01.2002 | DE | 03.04.2002 | [2006/14] |
Former [2003/30] | DE | 03.04.2002 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP0714140 (SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP]) [X] 1-5,8,13,15 * page 5, line 10 - page 8, column 20; claims 1,2 * [Y] 6,7,9-12,14,16; | [XY]EP0663697 (SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP]) [X] 1-5,8,13,15 * page 20, line 11 - page 21, line 18; claim 21 * [Y] 6,7,9-12,14,16; | [Y]EP0689085 (CANON KK [JP]) [Y] 6,7,9-12,14,16 * the whole document *; | [A]JPH06132306 ; | [A]JPH0555582 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940805), vol. 018, no. 419, Database accession no. (E - 1589), & JP06132306 A 19940513 (CASIO COMPUT CO LTD) [A] 1-16 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930706), vol. 017, no. 356, Database accession no. (E - 1394), & JP05055582 A 19930305 (SEMICONDUCTOR ENERGY LAB CO LTD) [A] 1-16 * abstract * |