EP0813145 - Pipelined instruction dispatch unit in a superscalar processor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.08.2006 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.12.2006 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): DE | published on 03.01.2007 [2007/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SUN MICROSYSTEMS, INC. 2550 Garcia Avenue Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | [1997/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tremblay, Marc 801 Waverley Street, No. 3 Palo Alto, California 94043 / US | [1997/51] | Representative(s) | WP Thompson 138 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/51] | W.P. THOMPSON & CO. Celcon House 289-293 High Holborn London WC1V 7HU / GB | Application number, filing date | 97303831.8 | 04.06.1997 | [1997/51] | Priority number, date | US19960662582 | 11.06.1996 Original published format: US 662582 | [1997/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0813145 | Date: | 17.12.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/51] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0813145 | Date: | 28.07.1999 | [1999/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0813145 | Date: | 05.10.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.06.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/38 | [1997/51] | CPC: |
G06F9/3885 (EP,US);
G06F9/3853 (EP,KR,US);
G06F9/3889 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, NL, SE [2000/14] |
Former [1997/51] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Pipeline-Befehlszuteilungseinheit in einem superskalaren Prozessor | [2005/14] | English: | Pipelined instruction dispatch unit in a superscalar processor | [1997/51] | French: | Unité en pipeline à répartition d'instructions dans un processeur superscalaire | [2005/14] |
Former [1997/51] | Befehlszuteilungseinheit mit Pipelinung in einem superskalaren Prozessor | ||
Former [1997/51] | Unité pipelinée à répartition d'instructions dans un processeur superscalaire | Examination procedure | 06.01.2000 | Examination requested [2000/10] | 29.01.2000 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 03.05.2000 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, PT | 03.05.2000 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) FR | 03.06.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.12.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.02.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.09.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 02.12.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.03.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.08.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 03.08.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.07.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/37] | Request for further processing for: | 02.12.2004 | Request for further processing filed | 02.12.2004 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 20.12.2004 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 24.02.2000 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 24.02.2000 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 24.02.2000 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 24.02.2000 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 24.02.2000 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 24.02.2000 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 24.02.2000 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 24.02.2000 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 24.02.2000 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 24.02.2000 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 24.02.2000 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 24.02.2000 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 24.02.2000 | PT   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 05.10.2005 | SE | 05.01.2006 | DE | 06.01.2006 | [2007/01] |
Former [2006/27] | NL | 05.10.2005 | |
SE | 05.01.2006 | ||
Former [2006/22] | NL | 05.10.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5497499 (GARG SANJIV [US], et al) [Y] 1-4,6 * column 7, line 58 - column 8, line 14 * * column 9, line 31 - line 33 * * column 15, line 51 - column 16, line 24 * * column 16, line 42 - line 44; figure 1 *; | [Y]US5127093 (MOORE JR WILLIAM T [US]) [Y] 1-4,6 * column 1, line 58 - line 63 * * column 3, line 5 - line 21 * * column 5, line 28 - line 53 * * column 6, line 33 - line 41 *; | [A]EP0651323 (ADVANCED MICRO DEVICES INC [US]) [A] 5 * column 9, line 4 - line 16 * * column 13, line 52 - column 14, line 8 * | [A] - SWEETMAN D, "SUPERSCALAR OR SUPERPIPELINED OR JUST HYPE?", NEW ELECTRONICS, (19911201), vol. 24, no. 11, pages 16 - 18, XP000310175 [A] 7,8 * the whole document * | [A] - POPESCU V ET AL, "THE METAFLOW ARCHITECTURE", IEEE MICRO, (19910601), vol. 11, no. 3, pages 10 - 13, 63 - 73, XP000237231 [A] 8,5,9 * page 2, column 1, paragraph 5 * * page 13, paragraph 6 - page 14, paragraph 1 * * page 6, paragraph 3; figures 2,3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/40.87564 |