EP0812998 - Multiple disk friction coupling device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1997/51] | Spring plates of multiple disk friction coupling device | ||
[2001/02] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.06.2002 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.06.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.08.2002 [2002/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DYNAX CORPORATION 1053-2 Kamiosatsu Chitose-shi Hokkaido / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1997/51] | For all designated states DYNAX CORPORATION 1053-2 Kamiosatsu Chitose-shi, Hokkaido / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Han, Zhi-peng c/o Dynax Corporation 1053-2 Kamiosatsu Chitose-shi, Hokkaido / JP | 02 /
Tasaka, Shigeki c/o Dynax Corporation 1053-2 Kamiosatsu Chitose-shi, Hokkaido / JP | [1997/51] | Representative(s) | Meddle, Alan L. FORRESTER & BOEHMERT, Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/51] | Meddle, Alan Leonard FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Franz-Joseph-Strasse 38 80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97304002.5 | 10.06.1997 | [1997/51] | Priority number, date | JP19960168722 | 10.06.1996 Original published format: JP 16872296 | [1997/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0812998 | Date: | 17.12.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0812998 | Date: | 22.08.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.10.1997 | Classification | IPC: | F16D13/58, F16F1/32, F16D25/0638 | [1997/51] | CPC: |
F16D25/0638 (EP,US);
F16D13/583 (EP,US);
F16F1/32 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR [1998/35] |
Former [1997/51] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Reibungslamellenkupplungsgerät | [2001/02] | English: | Multiple disk friction coupling device | [2001/02] | French: | Appareil d'accouplement à lamelles multiples par friction | [2001/02] |
Former [1997/51] | Tellerfeder von Reibungslamellenkupplungsgerät | ||
Former [1997/51] | Spring plates of multiple disk friction coupling device | ||
Former [1997/51] | Coupelles de ressort d'un appareil d'accouplement à lamelles multiples par friction | Examination procedure | 28.05.1998 | Examination requested [1998/31] | 19.10.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.04.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.09.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.03.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.09.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.11.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.11.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.02.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.04.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 25.04.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.05.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE400517 (KRUPP AG) [X] 1 * page 1, line 34 - line 38; figure 4 *; | [X]DE409973 (KRUPP AG) [X] 1,2 * page 1, line 23 - line 43; figure 3 *; | [X]DE692665 (ADOLF SCHNORR) [X] 1-3 * page 2, line 9 - line 13; figures 2,4 *; | [X]DE721154 (ADOLF SCHNORR) [X] 1-3 * page 1; figures 2,4 *; | [X]FR1010503 (MIGNY) [X] 1 * page 1, column R, paragraph 7 - page 2, column L, paragraph 10; figures 4-13 *; | [X]FR1575044 (PORSCHE) [X] 1,3* page 2, line 38 - line 39; figure 1 *; | [X]FR2193437 (FICHET BAUCHE [FR]) [X] 1-3 * page 1, line 29 - page 2, line 22; figures 1,2 *; | [X]US4276947 (HEBEL JAMES B) [X] 1 * column 14, line 65 - column 15, line 46; figures 7-7B *; | [X]GB2149863 (DAIKIN MFG CO LTD) [X] 1-3 * page 2, line 120 - page 3, line 18; figures 7-9 *; | [X]GB2158183 (FICHTEL & SACHS AG) [X] 1,3 * page 2, line 36 - line 83; figures 2,3 *; | [X]WO8703348 (VOITH GMBH J M [DE]) [X] 1-3 * page 6, paragraph 3 - page 7, paragraph 2; figures 1,2 * |