EP0884327 - Dendritic lysine-based polypeptides for targeted drug delivery [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.01.2002 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 21.01.2004 [2004/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE SCHOOL OF PHARMACY, UNIVERSITY OF LONDON 29-39 Brunswick Square London WC1N 1AX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/51] | For all designated states THE SCHOOL OF PHARMACY, UNIVERSITY OF LONDON 29/39 Brunswick Square London WC1N 1AX / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Florence, Alexander T. c/o The School of Pharmacy University of London 29/39 Brunswick Square London, WC1N 1AX / GB | 02 /
Sakthivel, Thiagarajan The School of Pharmacy University of London 29/39 Brunswick Square London, WC1N 1AX / GB | 03 /
Wilderspin, Andrew F. The School of Pharmacy University of London 29/39 Brunswick Square London, WC1N 1AX / GB | 04 /
Toth, Istvan The School of Pharmacy University of London 29/39 Brunswick Square London, WC1N 1AX / GB | [1998/51] | Representative(s) | Jones, Helen M.M. Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/51] | Jones, Helen Marjorie Meredith Gill Jennings & Every, Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 97304060.3 | 11.06.1997 | [1998/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0884327 | Date: | 16.12.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0884327 | Date: | 14.03.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.12.1997 | Classification | IPC: | C07K7/02, C07K14/00, A61K38/04, A61K38/16 | [2000/13] | CPC: |
C07K14/001 (EP,US);
A61K47/642 (EP,US);
A61K38/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1998/51] | C07K14/00, A61K38/04 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IE, IT, LI, NL [1999/36] |
Former [1999/34] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, LI | ||
Former [1998/51] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Dendritische, lysinhaltige Polypeptide zur gezielten Arzneimittelabreichung | [1998/51] | English: | Dendritic lysine-based polypeptides for targeted drug delivery | [1998/51] | French: | Polypeptides dendritiques à base de lysine pour apport ciblé de médicaments | [1998/51] | Examination procedure | 10.06.1999 | Examination requested [1999/32] | 10.08.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.12.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.03.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.09.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.11.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 28.11.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.12.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 14.03.2001 | LI | 14.03.2001 | NL | 14.03.2001 | IE | 11.06.2001 | ES | 27.09.2001 | [2004/04] |
Former [2003/09] | CH | 14.03.2001 | |
LI | 14.03.2001 | ||
NL | 14.03.2001 | ||
IE | 11.06.2001 | ||
Former [2002/48] | CH | 14.03.2001 | |
LI | 14.03.2001 | ||
IE | 11.06.2001 | ||
Former [2002/13] | CH | 14.03.2001 | |
LI | 14.03.2001 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]WO9402506 (UNIV LONDON PHARMACY [GB], et al) [AD] 1-20 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9500540 (WEBBER ROBERT [US]) [A] 1-20 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9411015 (MOLECULAR DYNAMICS INC [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * the whole document * |