EP0813018 - Tube coupling [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.09.2000 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.09.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.11.2000 [2000/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Guest, John Derek "Iona", Cannon Hill Way Maidenhead Berkshire SL6 2RX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/51] | For all designated states Guest, John Derek "Iona", Cannon Hill Way Maidenhead, Berkshire SL6 2RX / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1997/51] | Representative(s) | Bayliss, Geoffrey Cyril, et al BOULT WADE TENNANT Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/51] | Bayliss, Geoffrey Cyril, et al BOULT WADE TENNANT, 27 Furnival Street London EC4A 1PQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 97304108.0 | 12.06.1997 | [1997/51] | Priority number, date | GB19960012441 | 14.06.1996 Original published format: GB 9612441 | [1997/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0813018 | Date: | 17.12.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0813018 | Date: | 24.11.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.10.1997 | Classification | IPC: | F16L37/084, F16L37/092 | [1997/51] | CPC: |
F16L21/04 (EP,US);
F16L37/02 (EP,US);
F16L37/0845 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1998/35] |
Former [1997/51] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Rohrverbindung | [1997/51] | English: | Tube coupling | [1997/51] | French: | Raccord de tuyaux | [1997/51] | Examination procedure | 22.12.1997 | Examination requested [1998/10] | 21.04.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.06.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.10.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 17.12.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.04.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 19.05.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 31.05.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.08.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 27.08.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.08.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2491004 (GRAHAM JAMES B) [A] 1-3 * the whole document *; | [XA]FR1491388 (GARBISLANDER) [X] 1,2,6 * page 2; figure 5 * [A] 3-5,7; | [A]US3837687 (LEONARD G) [A] 5* abstract * |