EP0816888 - Buffered optical fiber having a strippable buffer layer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.03.2007 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.06.2009 | Change - representative | published on 15.07.2009 [2009/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC. 600 Mountain Avenue Murray Hill, NJ 07974-0636 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1998/02] | For all designated states LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC. 600 Mountain Avenue Murray Hill, New Jersey 07974-0636 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cahpin, John Thomas 13900 Bethany Oaks Pointe Alpharetta, Georgia 30201 / US | 02 /
Holman, James Robert Deceased / US | 03 /
Graham, Lionell 1450 Lakeshore Drive Snellville, Georgia 30278 / US | 04 /
Viriyayuthakorn, Montri 5255 Wyntree Court Norcross, Georgia 30071 / US | [1998/02] | Representative(s) | Schoppe, Fritz, et al Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler & Zinkler Patentanwälte Postfach 246 82043 Pullach bei München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/29] | Schoppe, Fritz, et al Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler & Zinkler Patentanwälte Postfach 246 82043 Pullach bei München / DE | ||
Former [2002/12] | Schoppe, Fritz, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler & Zinkler, Postfach 71 08 67 81458 München / DE | ||
Former [1998/02] | Johnston, Kenneth Graham, et al 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green Essex, IG8 OTU / GB | Application number, filing date | 97304397.9 | 23.06.1997 | [1998/02] | Priority number, date | US19960669119 | 24.06.1996 Original published format: US 669119 | [1998/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0816888 | Date: | 07.01.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0816888 | Date: | 19.04.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.10.1997 | Classification | IPC: | G02B6/44, C03C25/30 | [2006/13] | CPC: |
G02B6/443 (EP,US);
G02B6/4402 (EP,US);
G02B6/02 (EP,US);
G02B6/02395 (EP,US);
G02B6/245 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1998/02] | G02B6/44, C03C25/02 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1998/38] |
Former [1998/02] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Optische Faser mit einer abziehbaren Polsterschicht | [1998/02] | English: | Buffered optical fiber having a strippable buffer layer | [1998/02] | French: | Fibre optique avec couche tampon dénudable | [1998/02] | Examination procedure | 26.06.1998 | Examination requested [1998/35] | 30.01.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.06.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.12.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.04.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.09.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.01.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 05.01.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.01.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 05.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 04.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2004 | 08   M06   Fee paid on   05.07.2004 | 30.06.2005 | 09   M06   Fee paid on   04.10.2005 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]JPS61126512 ; | [A]GB2145841 (AMERICAN TELEPHONE & TELEGRAPH); | [A]EP0140415 (PHILIPS NV [NL]); | [XDY]US5011260 (MARX M FRED [US], et al); | [XA]EP0518523 (NORTHERN TELECOM LTD [CA]); | [XY]EP0527266 (CORNING INC [US]) |