EP0817105 - System for storing and playing a multimedia application adding a variety of services specific thereto [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.12.2005 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.12.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.01.2006 [2006/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2005/04] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP | ||
Former [1998/02] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka-fu, 571 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Machida, Kazuhiro 2-1-1-505, Oguradai Inzai-shi, Chiba-ken / JP | 02 /
Harada, Takenosuke 2-24-4-706, Minami Yamada Tsuzuki-ku, Yokohama / JP | 03 /
Kaneko, Shigeki 6-15-3-206, Hon-cho Funabashi-shi, Chiba-ken / JP | 04 /
Tsukidate, Ryota 2-20-5-633, Higashi Rokugo Oota-ku, Tokyo / JP | 05 /
Takeuchi, Yoshiyasu 2-20-5-724, Higashi Rokugo Oota-ku, Tokyo / JP | 06 /
Fujita, Kenichi 44-10-301, Hikawa-machi Itabashi-ku, Tokyo / JP | [1998/02] | Representative(s) | Senior, Alan Murray J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/02] | Senior, Alan Murray J.A. KEMP & CO., 14 South Square, Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 97304508.1 | 25.06.1997 | [1998/02] | Priority number, date | JP19960164992 | 25.06.1996 Original published format: JP 16499296 | JP19960169976 | 28.06.1996 Original published format: JP 16997696 | [1998/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0817105 | Date: | 07.01.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/02] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0817105 | Date: | 15.03.2000 | [2000/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0817105 | Date: | 26.01.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.02.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/30, H04N7/24, H04N7/16 | [2000/12] | CPC: |
H04N21/4332 (EP,US);
G06F16/40 (EP,US);
H04N21/2362 (EP,US);
H04N21/43074 (EP,US);
H04N21/4331 (EP,US);
H04N21/4345 (EP,US);
H04N21/4348 (EP,US);
H04N21/4722 (EP,US);
H04N21/47815 (EP,US);
H04N21/4784 (EP,US);
H04N21/812 (EP,US);
H04N21/8173 (EP,US);
H04N21/8549 (EP,US);
H04N21/858 (EP,US);
H04N7/162 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [1998/02] | G06F17/30 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2000/47] |
Former [1998/02] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | System zum Speichern und Spielen einer Multimediaanwendung und Hinzufügen von verschiedenen spezifischen Diensten | [1998/02] | English: | System for storing and playing a multimedia application adding a variety of services specific thereto | [1998/02] | French: | Système pour stocker et exécuter une application multimédia et y ajouter divers services spécifiques | [1998/02] | Examination procedure | 02.07.1997 | Examination requested [1998/02] | 17.12.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.04.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.08.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.12.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.03.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.08.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.05.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.11.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 22.11.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP04023652.3 / EP1494138 | Opposition(s) | 27.10.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0680216 (THOMSON CONSUMER ELECTRONICS [US]) [Y] 1-41 * abstract * * page 3, line 14 - page 3, line 40 * * page 4, line 19 - page 5, line 8 * * claim - *; | [Y] - COLAITIS F ET AL, "MHEG AND ITS PROFILE FOR ITV APPLICATIONS", IEE COLLOQUIUM ON INTERACTIVE TELEVISION, (19951002), XP000646001 [Y] 1-41 * the whole document * | [A] - GERHARD MÖLL, "Service Informationen (SI) für DVB Systeme", FERNSEH UND KINOTECHNIK,DE,VDE VERLAG GMBH. BERLIN, (19960401), ISSN 0015-0142, pages 163 - 171, XP002075221 [A] 1-41 * page 165, column 2, line 16 - page 166, column 2, line 8 * * figures 2,3 * | [A] - HOFRICHTER K, "MHEG 5 - STANDARDIZED PRESENTATION OBJECTS FOR THE SET TOP UNIT ENVIRONMENT", INTERACTIVE DISTRIBUTED MULTIMEDIA SYSTEMS AND SERVICES,XX,XX, (19960304), pages 33 - 44, XP000672134 [A] 1,8,33 * page 37, line 1 - page 39, line 21 * | [A] - HIRTZ G ET AL, "OPEN TV: BETRIEBSSYSTEM FUER INTERAKTIVES FERNSEHEN", FERNSEH UND KINOTECHNIK,DE,VDE VERLAG GMBH. BERLIN, (19960301), vol. 50, no. 3, ISSN 0015-0142, pages 84 - 89, XP000581417 [A] 1,2,8,33 * page 87, column 2, line 1 - page 88, column 1, line 28 * |