EP0816908 - Coupling of strongly and weakly guiding waveguides for compact integrated Mach Zehnder modulators [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.07.2005 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.05.2009 | Change - representative | published on 17.06.2009 [2009/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bookham Technology PLC 90 Milton Park Abingdon Oxfordshire OX14 4RY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/32] | For all designated states Bookham Technology PLC 90 Milton Park Abingdon, Oxfordshire OX14 4RY / GB | ||
Former [2000/39] | For all designated states Nortel Networks Limited World Trade Center of Montreal, 380 St. Antoine Street West, 8th floor Montreal, Quebec H2Y 3Y4 / CA | ||
Former [1999/28] | For all designated states NORTEL NETWORKS CORPORATION World Trade Center of Montreal 380 St. Antoine Street West 8th Floor Montreal, Quebec H2Y 3Y4 / CA | ||
Former [1999/09] | For all designated states NORTHERN TELECOM LIMITED World Trade Center of Montreal, 380 St. Antoine Street West, 8th Floor Montreal, Quebec H2Y 3Y4 / CA | ||
Former [1998/02] | For all designated states NORTHERN TELECOM LIMITED World Trade Center of Montreal, 380 St. Antoine Street West, 8th Floor Montreal, Quebec K2Y 3Y4 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rolland, Claude 871 Dundee Avenue Ottawa, Ontario, K2B 5T2 / CA | 02 /
Ku, Jun 7 Oakfern Crescent Stittsville, Ontario, K2X 1E5 / CA | [1998/02] | Representative(s) | Clayton-Hathway, Anthony Nicholas, et al Fry Heath & Spence LLP The Gables Massetts Road Horley Surrey RH6 7DQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/25] | Clayton-Hathway, Anthony Nicholas, et al Fry Heath & Spence LLP The Gables Massetts Road Horley Surrey RH6 7DQ / GB | ||
Former [2003/12] | Clayton-Hathway, Anthony Nicholas, et al Fry, Heath & Spence,LLP The Gables, Massetts Road Horley, Surrey RH6 7DQ / GB | ||
Former [2001/27] | Ertl, Nicholas Justin, et al Elkington and Fife, Prospect House, 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | ||
Former [1998/02] | Ryan, John Peter William, et al Nortel Patents, London Road Harlow, Essex CM17 9NA / GB | Application number, filing date | 97304743.4 | 01.07.1997 | [1998/02] | Priority number, date | US19960675757 | 03.07.1996 Original published format: US 675757 | [1998/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0816908 | Date: | 07.01.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/02] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0816908 | Date: | 16.09.1998 | [1998/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0816908 | Date: | 15.09.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.08.1998 | Classification | IPC: | G02B6/122, G02B6/26, G02F1/225, G02F1/025 | [1998/38] | CPC: |
G02F1/2257 (EP,US);
G02B6/1228 (EP,US);
G02B6/125 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1998/02] | G02F1/225, G02F1/025, G02B6/26 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1999/21] |
Former [1998/02] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Kopplung von schwach und stark leitenden Wellenleitern für kompakte integrierte Mach-Zehnder-Modulatoren | [1998/02] | English: | Coupling of strongly and weakly guiding waveguides for compact integrated Mach Zehnder modulators | [1998/02] | French: | Couplage de guides d'onde à guidage fort et faible pour modulateurs compacts intégrés du type Mach-Zehnder | [1998/02] | Examination procedure | 16.03.1999 | Examination requested [1999/19] | 22.10.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.04.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.01.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.05.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 21.05.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.06.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Rights in Rem or Legal Means of Execution | ID: | 01 | For: | all designated states | Date: | 30.10.2003 | [2004/41] | Documents cited: | Search | [XY] - WENGER G ET AL, "Design and fabrication of monolithic optical spot size transformers (MOSTs) for highly efficient fiber-chip coupling", JOURNAL OF LIGHTWAVE TECHNOLOGY, OCT. 1994, USA, ISSN 0733-8724, vol. 12, no. 10, pages 1782 - 1790, XP000469536 [X] 1 * abstract; sections I,II; figures 1,2 * * idem * [Y] 4-7 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/50.337491 | [YDA] - Ph.D. Thesis of J. YU, Queen's University,Kingston, Canada, 1994, Chapter 5 "Application of the BPM to the MQW Semiconductor Mach-Zehnder Modulator", XP002072096 [YD] 4-7 * sections 5.3,5.4,5.9,5.10 * * figures 5.1,5.3,5.4,5.31 * * idem * [A] 2,3,8,10 |