EP0819933 - Optical inspection method and apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.07.2004 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 15.10.2008 [2008/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Orbot Instruments Limited P.O. Box 601, Industrial Zone Yavne 70651 / IL | [1998/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Elyasaf, Emanuel 34 Weizmann Street Rehovot 76282 / IL | 02 /
Eran, Yair 21 Shpmozu Street Rehovot 76452 / IL | [1998/04] | Representative(s) | Evens, Paul Jonathan, et al Maguire Boss 24 East Street St. Ives, Cambridgeshire PE27 5PD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/42] | Evens, Paul Jonathan, et al Maguire Boss 24 East Street St. Ives Cambridge PE27 5PD / GB | ||
Former [1998/04] | Evens, Paul Jonathan, et al Maguire Boss, 5 Crown Street St. Ives, Cambridge PE17 4EB / GB | Application number, filing date | 97304746.7 | 01.07.1997 | [1998/04] | Priority number, date | IL19960118872 | 16.07.1996 Original published format: IL 11887296 | [1998/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0819933 | Date: | 21.01.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/04] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0819933 | Date: | 17.06.1998 | [1998/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0819933 | Date: | 10.09.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.05.1998 | Classification | IPC: | G01N21/88 | [1998/04] | CPC: |
G01N21/88 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1999/09] |
Former [1998/04] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur optischen Inspektion | [1998/04] | English: | Optical inspection method and apparatus | [1998/04] | French: | Procédé et dispositif d'inspection optique | [1998/04] | Examination procedure | 03.07.1998 | Examination requested [1998/36] | 05.09.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 12.04.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.01.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.05.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 16.05.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.06.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 04.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 10.09.2003 | [2006/14] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4952058 (NOGUCHI MINORI [JP], et al) [A] 1,11* column 5, line 64 - column 8, line 13; figure 1 *; | [A]EP0459489 (DAINIPPON SCREEN MFG [JP]) [A] 1,11 * abstract *; | [A]US5235400 (TERASAWA TSUNEO [JP], et al) [A] 1,11 * column 4, line 20 - line 54 * * column 10, line 55 - column 11, line 10; figures 1,10 *; | [A]US5495337 (GOSHORN LAWRENCE A [US], et al) [A] 1,11 * column 5, line 42 - column 6, line 33; figure 8A * | Examination | US3892492 | EP0024586 |