EP0816986 - System for recognizing motions [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1998/02] | Method, apparatus and system for recognizing motions | ||
[2006/10] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.09.2014 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.09.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.10.2014 [2014/41] | 05.09.2014 | Change - no opposition filed | published on 08.10.2014 [2014/41] | 05.09.2014 | Change - inventor | published on 08.10.2014 [2014/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2006/36] | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101 / JP | ||
Former [1998/02] | For all designated states HITACHI, LTD. 6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 101 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Unuma, Munetoshi 20-1, Mizuki-cho 2-chome Hitachi-shi, Ibaraki 316 / JP | 02 /
Nonaka, Shiro 3038-10, Sawa Hitachinaka-shi, Ibaraki 312 / JP | 03 /
Oho, Shigeru 74-7, Takaba Hitachinaka-shi, Ibaraki 312 / JP | 04 /
Yoshiaki, Usami c/o Hitachi, Ltd., 6-6, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8280 / JP | 05 /
Tsutomu, Nishioka c/o Hitachi, Ltd., 6-6, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8280 / JP | 06 /
Tomo, Yashiki c/o Hitachi, Ltd., 6-6, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8280 / JP | 07 /
Katsuo, Tashiro c/o Hitachi, Ltd., 6-6, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8280 / JP | [2014/41] |
Former [1998/02] | 01 /
Unuma, Munetoshi 20-1, Mizuki-cho 2-chome Hitachi-shi, Ibaraki 316 / JP | ||
02 /
Nonaka, Shiro 3038-10, Sawa Hitachinaka-shi, Ibaraki 312 / JP | |||
03 /
Oho, Shigeru 74-7, Takaba Hitachinaka-shi, Ibaraki 312 / JP | Representative(s) | Calderbank, Thomas Roger, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/02] | Calderbank, Thomas Roger, et al MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 97304807.7 | 02.07.1997 | [1998/02] | Priority number, date | JP19960173453 | 03.07.1996 Original published format: JP 17345396 | [1998/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0816986 | Date: | 07.01.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/02] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0816986 | Date: | 28.06.2000 | [2000/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0816986 | Date: | 06.09.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.05.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/00 | [1998/02] | CPC: |
A61B5/1123 (EP,US);
A43B3/34 (EP,US);
A61B5/1112 (EP,US);
A61B5/681 (EP,US);
A61B5/6828 (EP,US);
A61B5/6831 (EP,US);
G06F3/011 (EP,US);
G06F3/017 (EP,US);
G06V40/23 (EP,US);
A61B5/1117 (EP,US);
A61B5/112 (EP,US);
A61B5/7232 (EP,US);
A61B5/726 (EP,US);
A61B5/7264 (EP,US);
A63B2024/0071 (EP,US);
A63B24/0003 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2001/10] |
Former [1998/02] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | System zur Bewegungserkennung | [2006/10] | English: | System for recognizing motions | [2006/10] | French: | Système de reconnaissance du mouvement | [2006/10] |
Former [1998/02] | Verfahren, Gerät und System zur Bewegungserkennung | ||
Former [1998/02] | Method, apparatus and system for recognizing motions | ||
Former [1998/02] | Méthode, appareil et système de reconnaissance du mouvement | Examination procedure | 22.07.1997 | Examination requested [1998/02] | 17.10.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.04.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.04.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 02.06.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.02.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.06.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 13.06.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.06.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/33] | 07.06.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 22.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 24.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US5280265 (KRAMER JAMES F [US], et al) [X] 1,15-17,19,24 * column 3, line 64 - column 9, line 40 * * column 18, line 30 - column 19, line 36 * * figures 1-7,39A * [A] 2,18,23,25; | [XA]EP0264782 (YAMAHA CORP [JP]) [X] 1,2,16,17,19 * column 8, line 43 - column 16, line 46 * * column 17, line 42 - column 18, line 28 * * figures 1,2,7,8 * [A] 3,4,18,23-25; | [XA]EP0666544 (CANON KK [JP]) [X] 1,16,17,19,24 * column 3, line 35 - column 7, line 11 * * column 8, line 24 - column 9, line 5 * * figures 1-3 * [A] 25; | [X]US5516105 (EISENBREY GLEN T [US], et al) [X] 1,26 * column 2, lines 5-36 * * column 2, line 66 - column 5, line 55 * * figures 2-8 *; | [DA]US5483630 (UNUMA MUNETOSHI [JP], et al) [DA] 1,19,23-26 * column 6, line 51 - column 24, line 44 * * figures 1-48 * |