EP0815945 - Cyclone separator assembly [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.08.2003 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.10.2003 [2003/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KVAERNER PROCESS SYSTEMS A.S. P.O. Box 13 1361 Billingstad / NO | [1998/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gould, Peter 31 Lambourne Close Ledbury, Herefordshire, HR8 2HW / GB | 02 /
Grewer, Martin Dennis 32 Celandine Way Evesham, Worcestershire / GB | [1998/02] | Representative(s) | Carpenter, David Marks & Clerk LLP Alpha Tower Suffolk Street Queensway Birmingham B1 1TT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/02] | Carpenter, David MARKS & CLERK, Alpha Tower, Suffolk Street Queensway Birmingham B1 1TT / GB | Application number, filing date | 97304926.5 | 04.07.1997 | [1998/02] | Priority number, date | GB19960014257 | 06.07.1996 Original published format: GB 9614257 | [1998/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0815945 | Date: | 07.01.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/02] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0815945 | Date: | 18.11.1998 | [1998/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0815945 | Date: | 09.10.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.10.1998 | Classification | IPC: | B04C5/28 | [1998/02] | CPC: |
B04C5/28 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | GB [2002/36] |
Former [1999/30] | FR, GB | ||
Former [1998/02] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Zyklonabscheideranordnung | [1998/02] | English: | Cyclone separator assembly | [1998/02] | French: | Agencement de séparateurs à cyclone | [1998/02] | Examination procedure | 14.05.1999 | Examination requested [1999/28] | 19.05.1999 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 21.10.1999 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) DK, IT, NL | 13.03.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 19.10.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.12.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.05.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.07.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 12.07.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.07.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 11.08.1999 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 11.08.1999 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 11.08.1999 | NL   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPS5681149 ; | [AD]GB2258174 (CONOCO SPECIALTY PROD [US]) [AD] 1,9,10 * page 7, line 23 - page 15, line 20 * * figures 3-8 *; | [AD]GB2136327 (OHISHI ENGINEERING LIMITED COM) | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19810918), vol. 5, no. 148, Database accession no. (C - 072), & JP56081149 A 19810702 (HITACHI) [X] 1-3,9-11 * abstract * |