EP0818589 - Vacuum toilet [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.11.2003 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.11.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.01.2004 [2004/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Evac International Oy Purotie 1 00380 Helsinki / FI | [1998/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Olin, Hendry Matkakuji 1 2940 Espoo / FI | 02 /
Lindroos, Gunnar Uotinmäentie 9 H 60 00970 Helsinki / FI | 03 /
Mattsson, Roland Saarniraiviontie 5 C 14 02770 Espoo / FI | [1998/03] | Representative(s) | Manaton, Ross Timothy Bromhead Johnson LLP 57-59 High Street Twyford, Berkshire RG10 9AJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/03] | Manaton, Ross Timothy JY & GW Johnson, Kingsbourne House, 229-231 High Holborn London WC1V 7DP / GB | Application number, filing date | 97304982.8 | 08.07.1997 | [1998/03] | Priority number, date | FI19960002791 | 09.07.1996 Original published format: FI 962791 | [1998/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0818589 | Date: | 14.01.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/03] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0818589 | Date: | 23.09.1998 | [1998/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.08.1998 | Classification | IPC: | E03D5/00 | [1998/03] | CPC: |
E03D5/00 (EP,US);
E03D11/00 (EP,US);
E03F1/006 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IT, NL, SE [1999/22] |
Former [1998/03] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Vakuum Toilette | [1998/03] | English: | Vacuum toilet | [1998/03] | French: | Toilettes à vide | [1998/03] | Examination procedure | 17.08.1998 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.01.1999 | Examination requested [1999/10] | 11.10.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.04.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.06.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.12.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.03.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.07.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.08.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.01.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/01] | 07.02.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2004/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2003 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR1354106 (L'HONORE) [A] 1,2,5,9 * page 1, column L, line 40 - column R, line 4 * * page 1, column R, line 37 - line 40; figure - *; | [X]US4041554 (GREGORY CHARLES E, et al) [X] 1,2,4,6,9,10 * column 3, line 22 - column 4, line 49; figures 1-3 *; | [A]NL9102014 (KONINKL SPHINX NV) [A] 7* figure - *; | [A]WO9410397 (BURTON MECH CONTRACTORS [US]) [A] 1 * page 6, line 19 - page 7, line 16; figures 1,2 *; | [A]DE4413493 (EVAC AB [SE]) [A] 1 * figure 1 *; | [A]EP0659945 (JAPANIC CORP [JP]) [A] 1,4,6,9,10 * column 5, line 23 - column 6, line 44; figures 2-5 * |