EP0818799 - Cathode structure for a plasma addressed liquid crystal display panel [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.01.2002 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.01.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.03.2002 [2002/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TEKTRONIX, INC. 26600 S W Parkway Avenue P.O. Box 1000 Wilsonville, Oregon 97070-1000 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1998/03] | For all designated states TEKTRONIX, INC. 26600 S W Parkway Avenue, P.O. Box 1000 Wilsonville, Oregon 97070-1000 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Roberson, Mark W. 110 Lamlash Lane Cary North Carolina 27511 / US | 02 /
Hinchcliffe, Robert D. 18815 NE Ribbon Ridge Road Newburg, Oregon 97132 / US | 03 /
Ilcisin, Kevin J. 16728 SW Hargis Road Beaverton, Oregon 97007 / US | 04 /
Moore, John S. 15087 NW Oakmont Loop Beaverton, Oregon 97006 / US | [1998/03] | Representative(s) | Burke, Steven David, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/03] | Burke, Steven David, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 97305007.3 | 08.07.1997 | [1998/03] | Priority number, date | US19960021625P | 12.07.1996 Original published format: US 21625 P | [1998/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0818799 | Date: | 14.01.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/03] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0818799 | Date: | 23.09.1998 | [1998/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.08.1998 | Classification | IPC: | H01J17/06, H01J17/48 | [1998/03] | CPC: |
H01J17/485 (EP,KR,US);
G02F1/13334 (EP,KR,US);
G02F1/134309 (KR);
G02F1/13439 (KR);
H01J17/066 (EP,US);
G09G3/3662 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1999/22] |
Former [1998/03] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Kathodenstruktur für eine plasmaadressierte Flüssigkristallanzeigetafel | [1998/03] | English: | Cathode structure for a plasma addressed liquid crystal display panel | [1998/03] | French: | Structure de cathode pour un panneau d'affichage à cristaux liquides à adressage par plasma | [1998/03] | Examination procedure | 22.03.1999 | Examination requested [1999/20] | 30.03.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.07.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/11] | 02.10.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2002/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2079046 (PHILIPS NV) [A] 1,2,6,7 * page 2, line 71 - line 95 * * page 4, line 49 - line 54 *; | [A]JPH0594760 ; | [A]JPS58209847 ; | [A]WO9619789 (PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [A] 1,2,6,7 * figure 2 * * page 4, line 34 - page 5, line 11 *; | [A]JPH0495332 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930813), vol. 017, no. 440, Database accession no. (E - 1414), & JP05094760 A 19930416 (FUTABA CORP) [A] 1,2,6,7 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19840317), vol. 008, no. 059, Database accession no. (E - 232), & JP58209847 A 19831206 (FUJITSU KK) [A] 1,2,6,7 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920715), vol. 016, no. 324, Database accession no. (E - 1234), & JP04095332 A 19920327 (OKI ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [A] 2,4 * abstract * * page 9, line 32 - page 10, line 2 * |