EP0821492 - Error-correcting code generating circuit and modulator apparatus using the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.02.2004 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.10.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 19.11.2008 [2008/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [2008/47] |
Former [1998/05] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hiramatsu, Katsuhiko 382-17-102, Tokiwadai, Hodogaya-ku Yokohama-shi / JP | [1998/05] | Representative(s) | Smith, Norman Ian, et al Cleveland 40-43 Chancery Lane London WC2A 1JQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/05] | Smith, Norman Ian, et al F.J. CLEVELAND & COMPANY 40-43 Chancery Lane London WC2A 1JQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 97305079.2 | 10.07.1997 | [1998/05] | Priority number, date | JP19960212188 | 24.07.1996 Original published format: JP 21218896 | [1998/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0821492 | Date: | 28.01.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/05] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0821492 | Date: | 07.03.2001 | [2001/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.01.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H03M13/00 | [1998/05] | CPC: |
H03M13/15 (EP);
H03M13/25 (EP);
H03M13/251 (EP);
H04L1/0044 (EP);
H04L1/0057 (EP);
H04L1/24 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FI, FR, GB, SE [2001/48] |
Former [1998/05] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Fehlerkorrekturkode-Erzeugungsschaltung und Modulatorvorrichtung für seine Anwendung | [1998/05] | English: | Error-correcting code generating circuit and modulator apparatus using the same | [1998/05] | French: | Circuit générateur de code de correction d'erreur et modulateur utilisant ce circuit | [1998/05] | Examination procedure | 18.07.1997 | Examination requested [1998/05] | 12.05.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.09.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/14] | 27.10.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2004/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP0408362 (CANON KK [JP]) [X] 1 * abstract * * page 2, line 12 - line 30 * * page 3, line 4 - line 20 * * page 3, line 41 - line 47 * * page 3, line 55 - page 6, line 33 * * figures 1,3,5 * [Y] 2-6; | [X]EP0341851 (DIGITAL EQUIPMENT CORP [US]) [X] 1 * abstract * * column 6, line 20 - column 8, line 57 * * figure 2 *; | [Y]US5168509 (NAKAMURA MAKOTO [JP], et al) [Y] 2,3 * abstract * * column 8, line 40 - line 61 * * column 9, line 3 - column 10, line 26 * * figure 3 *; | [Y]EP0490618 (SONY CORP [JP]) [Y] 4-6 * abstract * * column 4, line 4 - column 5, line 31 * * column 7, line 10 - line 20 * * column 7, line 41 - column 8, line 30 * * figures 1,3-5,7,8 *; | [A]US3784743 (SCHROEDER H) [A] 4-6 * abstract * * column 2, line 65 - column 4, line 10 * * figure 1 * |