EP0819629 - A method of transporting a solids component of a slurry [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.04.2005 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.04.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.05.2005 [2005/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Merpro Products Limited Brent Avenue, Forties Road Industrial Estate Montrose Angus DD10 9JA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/04] | For all designated states Merpro Products Limited Brent Avenue, Forties Road Industrial Estate Montrose, Angus DD10 9JA / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Delves, James Edward 16 Drakes Way Portishead, Bristol / GB | 02 /
Parkinson, David John 7 Drakes Way Portishead, Bristol BS20 7LB / GB | [1998/04] | Representative(s) | Jackson, Peter Arthur GILL JENNINGS & EVERY Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/04] | Jackson, Peter Arthur GILL JENNINGS & EVERY Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 97305080.0 | 10.07.1997 | [1998/04] | Priority number, date | GB19960014859 | 15.07.1996 Original published format: GB 9614859 | [1998/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0819629 | Date: | 21.01.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0819629 | Date: | 26.05.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.10.1997 | Classification | IPC: | B65G53/30 | [1998/04] | CPC: |
B65G53/30 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1998/40] |
Former [1998/04] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Förderverfahren für feste Komponenten einer Suspension | [1998/04] | English: | A method of transporting a solids component of a slurry | [1998/04] | French: | Procédé de transport d'un constituant solide d'une suspension | [1998/04] | Examination procedure | 03.07.1998 | Examination requested [1998/36] | 22.07.1998 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 16.11.1998 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, FI, GR, IE, LI, LU, MC, PT | 04.03.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.03.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.01.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.07.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 08.07.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.03.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 31.08.1998 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 31.08.1998 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 31.08.1998 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 31.08.1998 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 31.08.1998 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 31.08.1998 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 31.08.1998 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 31.08.1998 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 31.08.1998 | PT   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR1461616 (S.O.G.R.E.A.H.) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US4699548 (BERGSTROM DAVID A) [A] 1 * column W *; | [A]GB2161469 (CONOCO INC) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9507325 (MERPRO TORTEK LTD ;PARKINSON DAVID JOHN (GB)) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]GB1059488 (HUGHES TOOL COMPANY) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]GB1032537 (HUGHES TOOL COMPANY) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]DE1246555 (HUGHES TOOL COMPANY) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9605128 (MERPRO TORTEK LTD ;PARKINSON DAVID JOHN (GB); DELVES JAMES EDWARD) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]FR2633263 (MOSKOVSKY GEOLOGORAZVEDOCHNY INSTITUT IMENI SERGO ORDZHONIKIDZE) [A] 1 * the whole document * |