EP0869668 - Instant CCD camera [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.11.1999 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.11.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.01.2000 [2000/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ma, Hsi-Kuang 4F, No. 48, Sec. 2, Chung Cherng Road Taipei / TW | [1998/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1998/41] | Representative(s) | Loven, Keith James Loven Patents & Trademarks West Central Runcorn Road Lincoln LN6 3QP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/41] | Loven, Keith James Loven & Co Quantum House 30 Tentercroft Street Lincoln LN5 7DB / GB | Application number, filing date | 97305394.5 | 18.07.1997 | [1998/41] | Priority number, date | CN1997202606 | 01.04.1997 Original published format: CN 97202606 | [1998/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0869668 | Date: | 07.10.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.08.1998 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/225 | [1998/41] | CPC: |
H04N23/51 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [1999/24] |
Former [1998/41] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Sofort Bild-CCD-Kamera | [1998/41] | English: | Instant CCD camera | [1998/41] | French: | Dispositif de prise de vue instantanée à transfert de charges | [1998/41] | Examination procedure | 08.04.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2000/01] | 10.08.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2000/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 27.05.1999 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 27.05.1999 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 27.05.1999 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 27.05.1999 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 27.05.1999 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 27.05.1999 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 27.05.1999 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 27.05.1999 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 27.05.1999 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 27.05.1999 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 27.05.1999 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 27.05.1999 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 27.05.1999 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 27.05.1999 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 27.05.1999 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 27.05.1999 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 27.05.1999 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 27.05.1999 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]JPH02207678 ; | [A]JPH03216092 ; | [XY]US4516157 (CAMPBELL MALCOLM G [NZ]) [X] 1,4,7,8 * column 1, line 43 - column 2, line 27 * * column 2, line 47 - column 3, line 33 * * column 4, line 42 - column 5, line 55 * [Y] 3; | [A]GB2292038 (LAM DAVID CHOON SEN [GB]) [A] 1,4,7-9 * page 2, line 8 - line 18 * * page 3, line 13 - line 17 * * page 6, line 5 - page 7, line 18 *; | [A]US5583571 (FRIEDLAND MICHAEL [US]) [A] 1-9 * column 1, line 36 - line 57 * * column 2, line 1 - line 66 * | [XY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19901102), vol. 014, no. 502, Database accession no. (E - 0997), & JP02207678 A 19900817 (HITACHI LTD) [X] 7,8 * abstract * [Y] 3 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19911213), vol. 015, no. 494, Database accession no. (E - 1145), & JP03216092 A 19910924 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO LTD) [A] 3,8 * abstract * |