EP0824292 - Asynchronous transfer mode (ATM) connection protection switching apparatus and method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 25.08.2006 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.10.2008 | Change - representative | published on 12.11.2008 [2008/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC. 600 Mountain Avenue Murray Hill, NJ 07974-0636 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1998/08] | For all designated states LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC. 600 Mountain Avenue Murray Hill, New Jersey 07974-0636 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Anderson, Jon 285 Old Bridge Road Brielle, New Jersey 08730 / US | 02 /
Noh, Tai H. 9 Alexandria Drive Manalapan, New Jersey 07726 / US | 03 /
Newton, Curtis J. 36 Joyce Road Medford, Massachusetts 02155 / US | [1998/08] | Representative(s) | Sarup, David Alexander, et al Alcatel-Lucent Telecom Ltd Patent Business c/o Nokia 125 Finsbury Pavement London EC2A 1NQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/46] | Sarup, David Alexander, et al Alcatel-Lucent Telecom Limited Unit 18, Core 3, Workzone Innova Business Park Electric Avenue Enfield EN3 7XU / GB | ||
Former [2006/09] | Sarup, David Alexander, et al Lucent Technologie NS UK Limited 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green, Essex IG8 0TU / GB | ||
Former [1998/08] | Watts, Christopher Malcolm Kelway, Dr., et al Lucent Technologies (UK) Ltd, 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green Essex, IG8 0TU / GB | Application number, filing date | 97305699.7 | 29.07.1997 | [1998/08] | Priority number, date | US19960689175 | 06.08.1996 Original published format: US 689175 | [1998/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0824292 | Date: | 18.02.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/08] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0824292 | Date: | 18.10.2000 | [2000/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.09.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/56, H04Q11/04 | [1998/08] | CPC: |
H04Q11/0478 (EP,US);
H04L2012/5619 (EP,US);
H04L2012/5627 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, SE [2001/27] |
Former [1998/08] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Einrichtung und Verfahren zur ATM-Schutzumschaltung | [1998/08] | English: | Asynchronous transfer mode (ATM) connection protection switching apparatus and method | [1998/08] | French: | Appareil et procédé pour la commutation protectrice à ATM | [1998/08] | Examination procedure | 05.04.2001 | Examination requested [2001/23] | 25.07.2006 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2006/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 21.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - HIROYUKI FUJII ET AL, "RESTORATION MESSAGE TRANSFER MECHANISM AND RESTORATION CHARACTERISTICS OF DOUBLE-SEARCH SELF-HEALING ATM NETWORK", IEEE JOURNAL ON SELECTED AREAS IN COMMUNICATIONS,US,IEEE INC. NEW YORK, (1994), vol. 12, no. 1, ISSN 0733-8716, pages 149 - 157, XP000493896 [X] 1 * section V * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/49.265714 | [A] - MUN CHOON CHAN ET AL, "AN ARCHITECTURE FOR BROADBAND VIRTUAL NETWORKS UNDER CUSTOMER CONTROL", IEEE NETWORK OPERATIONS AND MANAGEMENT SYMPOSIUM (NOMS),US,NEW YORK, IEEE, (19960415), vol. SYMP. 5, ISBN 0-7803-2519-2, pages 135 - 144, XP000641086 [A] 1 * page 137, paragraph 1 - page 138, paragraph 3 * |