EP0828287 - Improvements in or relating to semiconductors [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.05.2001 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.05.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.06.2001 [2001/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Texas Instruments Incorporated 13500 North Central Expressway Dallas, Texas 75265 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1998/11] | For all designated states TEXAS INSTRUMENTS INCORPORATED 13500 North Central Expressway Dallas Texas 75265 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wilk, Glenn D. 9050 Markville Drive, Apt. 821 Dallas, Texas 75243 / US | 02 /
Wallace, Robert M. 428 Park Bend Drive Richardson, Texas 75081 / US | 03 /
Wei, Yi, Motorola Flat Panel Display Division 7700 South River Parkway, FPD24 Tempe, Arizona 85284 / US | [1998/11] | Representative(s) | Darby, David Thomas, et al Abel & Imray, 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/11] | Darby, David Thomas, et al Abel & Imray Northumberland House 303-306 High Holborn London WC1V 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 97305923.1 | 05.08.1997 | [1998/11] | Priority number, date | US19960023230P | 05.08.1996 Original published format: US 23230 P | [1998/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0828287 | Date: | 11.03.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0828287 | Date: | 02.09.1998 | [1998/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.07.1998 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/20, H01L21/306, H01L21/316, H01L21/28 | [1998/33] | CPC: |
H01L21/02043 (EP,US);
H01L21/205 (KR);
H01L21/02046 (EP,US);
H01L21/02238 (EP,US);
H01L21/02255 (EP,US);
H01L21/02301 (EP,US);
H01L21/02312 (EP,US);
H01L21/02381 (EP,US);
H01L21/02532 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [1998/11] | H01L21/20, H01L21/306 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1999/19] |
Former [1998/11] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verbesserungen in oder in Bezug auf Halbleiter | [1998/11] | English: | Improvements in or relating to semiconductors | [1998/11] | French: | Améliorations aux ou relativés aux semi-conducteurs | [1998/11] | Examination procedure | 17.02.1999 | Examination requested [1999/16] | 02.06.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.12.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2001/26] | 19.01.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2001/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPS63262839 ; | [A]JPS63150915 ; | [A]US5360769 (THAKUR RANDHIR P S [US], et al) [A] 13,14,16-18 * column A *; | [X]EP0637063 (APPLIED MATERIALS INC [US]) [X] 1,9-14 * abstract *; | [X] - SAITO K ET AL, "EFFECT OF SILICON SURFACE CLEANING ON THE INITIAL STAGE OF SELECTIVE TITANIUM SILICIDE CHEMICAL VAPOR DEPOSITION", JAPANESE JOURNAL OF APPLIED PHYSICS, SUPPLEMENTS, (19890828), page 541/542, XP000087384 [X] 1-3,9-12,15,19 * page 541, paragraph 2 * | [X] - KUNII ET AL, "Si surface cleaning by Si2H6-H2 gas etching and its effects on solid-phase epitaxy", JAPANESE JOURNAL OF APPLIED PHYSICS., TOKYO JP, (198711), vol. 26, no. 11, pages 1816 - 1822, XP002067781 [X] 1-5,9-11,19 * page 1817, column R, paragraphs 1-3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1143/JJAP.26.1816 | [XA] - HANSEN ET AL, "Improvement of the morphological quality of the Si surface using an optimized in-situ oxide removal procedure prior to MBE growth", JOURNAL OF CRYSTAL GROWTH, AMSTERDAM NL, (199512), vol. 157, no. 1-4, pages 317 - 322, XP002067782 [X] 1-3,6-8,11,19 * abstract * [A] 12-18 | [A] - HARDEMAN ET AL, "Oxide removal from silicon wafers studied by transient mass spectrometry and X-ray photoelectron spectroscopy", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 1ST INT. SYMP. ON SILICON MOLECULAR BEAM EPITAXY, TORONTO, ONT, CANADA, (19850514), pages 16 - 26, XP002067959 [A] 1 * page 20, paragraph 4 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890223), vol. 13, no. 81, Database accession no. (E - 719), & JP63262839 A 19881031 (NEC) [X] 1,4,5 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19881031), vol. 12, no. 412, Database accession no. (E - 676), & JP63150915 A 19880623 (SANYO ELECTRIC) [A] 1 * abstract * |