EP0823234 - Novelty device for attachment to an article [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.01.2004 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 08.10.2008 [2008/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Megaprint Group Limited Mega House, 159A High Street Hampton Hill Middlesex TW12 1NL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/26] | For all designated states Megaprint Group Limited Mega House, 159A High Street Hampton Hill, Middlesex TW12 1NL / GB | ||
Former [2000/05] | For all designated states Admote Limited Mega House, 159A High Street Hampton Hill, Middlesex TW12 1NL / GB | ||
Former [1998/07] | For all designated states Megaprint Group Limited Mega House, 159A High Street Hampton Hill, Middlesex TW12 1NL / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Aiken, Mary 78 Park Avenue Sandymount, Dublin 4 / IE | [1998/07] | Representative(s) | Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/41] | Carpmaels & Ransford One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | ||
Former [2002/40] | Carpmaels & Ransford 43 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | ||
Former [2001/17] | Carpmael, John William Maurice, et al CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square London, WC1A 2RA / GB | ||
Former [1998/07] | Votier, Sidney David CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43, Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 97305938.9 | 05.08.1997 | [1998/07] | Priority number, date | GB19960016564 | 07.08.1996 Original published format: GB 9616564 | [1998/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0823234 | Date: | 11.02.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/07] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0823234 | Date: | 08.12.1999 | [1999/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0823234 | Date: | 19.03.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.10.1999 | Classification | IPC: | A47G21/00, B43K29/00 | [1998/07] | CPC: |
A47G21/02 (EP,US);
B43K29/00 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24314 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IE, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [2000/33] |
Former [1998/07] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Neuheitsartikel zur Befestigung auf einem Gegenstand | [1998/07] | English: | Novelty device for attachment to an article | [1998/07] | French: | Dispositif nouveau pour être fixé à un article | [1998/07] | Examination procedure | 16.05.2000 | Examination requested [2000/28] | 15.05.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.06.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.07.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.12.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 12.12.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.12.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 19.03.2003 | BE | 19.03.2003 | CH | 19.03.2003 | IT | 19.03.2003 | LI | 19.03.2003 | DK | 19.06.2003 | SE | 19.06.2003 | PT | 20.06.2003 | IE | 05.08.2003 | [2008/07] |
Former [2004/40] | AT | 19.03.2003 | |
BE | 19.03.2003 | ||
CH | 19.03.2003 | ||
LI | 19.03.2003 | ||
DK | 19.06.2003 | ||
SE | 19.06.2003 | ||
PT | 20.06.2003 | ||
IE | 05.08.2003 | ||
Former [2004/23] | AT | 19.03.2003 | |
BE | 19.03.2003 | ||
CH | 19.03.2003 | ||
LI | 19.03.2003 | ||
DK | 19.06.2003 | ||
SE | 19.06.2003 | ||
PT | 20.06.2003 | ||
Former [2004/10] | AT | 19.03.2003 | |
BE | 19.03.2003 | ||
CH | 19.03.2003 | ||
LI | 19.03.2003 | ||
SE | 19.06.2003 | ||
PT | 20.06.2003 | ||
Former [2004/01] | AT | 19.03.2003 | |
CH | 19.03.2003 | ||
LI | 19.03.2003 | ||
SE | 19.06.2003 | ||
PT | 20.06.2003 | ||
Former [2003/50] | AT | 19.03.2003 | |
CH | 19.03.2003 | ||
LI | 19.03.2003 | ||
SE | 19.06.2003 | ||
Former [2003/47] | AT | 19.03.2003 | |
CH | 19.03.2003 | ||
LI | 19.03.2003 | ||
Former [2003/40] | CH | 19.03.2003 | |
LI | 19.03.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]US2787055 (WERTZ JOHN L); | [X]US3299891 (SMETON ROBERT L) [X] 1-6 * column 2, line 15 - column 3, line 24; figure - *; | [X]US3615596 (PETTI ALBERT F, et al) [X] 1,2,4,6 * column W *; | [X]US5479708 (THOMAS MARTHA M [US]) [X] 1,2,5,6 * column 3, line 44 - column 4, line 17; figures 1-3 * |