EP0823491 - Gas injection system for CVD reactors [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.01.2003 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 26.02.2003 [2003/09] | 11.01.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.02.2003 [2003/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Concept Systems Design Inc. 2800 Bayview Drive Fremont California 94538 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1998/07] | For all designated states Concept Systems Design Inc. 2800 Bayview Drive Fremont, California 94538 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Macleish, Joseph H 2529 Wild Horse Drive San Ramon, CA 94583 / US | 02 /
Mailho, Robert D 14338 Kirk Alan Lane Sonora, CA 95370 / US | 03 /
Sanganeria, Mahesh K 395 Ano Nuevo Avenue 612 Sunnyvale, CA 94086 / US | 04 /
Del Solar, Enrique Suarez 2536 Leimert Boulevard Oakland, CA 94602 / US | [1998/07] | Representative(s) | Atkinson, Ralph, et al Atkinson & Company Intellectual Property Limited 7 Moorgate Road Rotherham South Yorkshire S60 2BF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/07] | Atkinson, Ralph, et al Atkinson & Co., The Technology Park, 60 Shirland Lane Sheffield S9 3SP / GB | Application number, filing date | 97305982.7 | 06.08.1997 | [1998/07] | Priority number, date | US19960693721 | 07.08.1996 Original published format: US 693721 | US19970876967 | 16.06.1997 Original published format: US 876967 | [1998/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0823491 | Date: | 11.02.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/07] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0823491 | Date: | 20.01.1999 | [1999/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0823491 | Date: | 27.02.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.12.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C23C16/44, H01L21/00 | [1998/07] | CPC: |
C23C16/45508 (EP);
C23C16/45519 (EP);
C23C16/4557 (EP);
C23C16/45591 (EP);
C23C16/4584 (EP);
C23C16/46 (EP);
C30B25/10 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1998/07] | Title | German: | Gaseinleitsystem für CVD Reaktoren | [1998/07] | English: | Gas injection system for CVD reactors | [1998/07] | French: | Système d'injection de gaz pour réacteurs CVD | [1998/07] | Examination procedure | 17.08.1998 | Examination requested [1998/42] | 21.03.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.07.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.04.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.08.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.11.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 14.11.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.11.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 27.02.2002 | [2003/09] | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0254651 (ULVAC CORP) [X] 17 * claims 1-5 *; | [A]EP0675524 (APPLIED MATERIALS INC) [A] 1,9,17 * the whole document *; | [A]US5338363 (KAWATA YOSHINOBU ET AL) [A] 1,9,17 * column 11, line 36 - column 12, line 2; figure 10 *; | [A]EP0480181 (GASONICS INC) |