EP0824132 - Thermoplastic resin composition containing titanium dioxide pigment, and process for preparing same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.09.2002 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.10.2009 | Change - representative | published on 25.11.2009 [2009/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SHOWA DENKO K.K. 13-9, Shiba Daimon 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-0011 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2001/45] | For all designated states SHOWA DENKO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 13-9, Shiba Daimon 1-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo 105-0011 / JP | ||
Former [1998/08] | For all designated states SHOWA DENKO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 13-9, Shiba Daimon 1-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo 105 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Maeda, Masashi Daiaparesu-matsumotoohte 308, 6-13, Ohte 5-chome Matsumoto-shi, Nagano 390 / JP | 02 /
Ito, Katsura 13-10, Daimon Nanaban-cho Shiojiri-shi, Nagano 399-07 / JP | [1998/08] | Representative(s) | Wise, Stephen James, et al Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow, G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/48] | Wise, Stephen James, et al Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow, G5 8PL / GB | ||
Former [1998/08] | Wise, Stephen James, et al c/o RAWORTH, MOSS & COOK, Raworth House, 36 Sydenham Road Croydon, Surrey CR0 2EF / GB | Application number, filing date | 97306002.3 | 07.08.1997 | [1998/08] | Priority number, date | JP19960214758 | 14.08.1996 Original published format: JP 21475896 | [1998/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0824132 | Date: | 18.02.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0824132 | Date: | 07.11.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.12.1997 | Classification | IPC: | C08K9/06, C08K3/22 | [1998/08] | CPC: |
C08K9/06 (EP,US);
C08K3/22 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1998/08] | Title | German: | Titandioxidpigment enthaltende thermoplastische Harzzusammensetzung und Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung | [1998/08] | English: | Thermoplastic resin composition containing titanium dioxide pigment, and process for preparing same | [1998/08] | French: | Composition thermoplastique de résine contenant un pigment de dioxide de titane et son procédé de préparation | [1998/08] | Examination procedure | 27.04.1998 | Examination requested [1998/26] | 01.02.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 03.09.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.03.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 02.12.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.01.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 30.03.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.06.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 29.06.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.08.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 07.11.2001 | BE | 07.11.2001 | CH | 07.11.2001 | FI | 07.11.2001 | FR | 07.11.2001 | GR | 07.11.2001 | IT | 07.11.2001 | LI | 07.11.2001 | DK | 07.02.2002 | PT | 07.02.2002 | SE | 07.02.2002 | ES | 30.05.2002 | IE | 07.08.2002 | LU | 07.08.2002 | [2008/07] |
Former [2006/14] | AT | 07.11.2001 | |
BE | 07.11.2001 | ||
CH | 07.11.2001 | ||
FI | 07.11.2001 | ||
FR | 07.11.2001 | ||
GR | 07.11.2001 | ||
LI | 07.11.2001 | ||
DK | 07.02.2002 | ||
PT | 07.02.2002 | ||
SE | 07.02.2002 | ||
ES | 30.05.2002 | ||
IE | 07.08.2002 | ||
LU | 07.08.2002 | ||
Former [2004/39] | AT | 07.11.2001 | |
BE | 07.11.2001 | ||
CH | 07.11.2001 | ||
FI | 07.11.2001 | ||
GR | 07.11.2001 | ||
LI | 07.11.2001 | ||
DK | 07.02.2002 | ||
PT | 07.02.2002 | ||
SE | 07.02.2002 | ||
ES | 30.05.2002 | ||
IE | 07.08.2002 | ||
LU | 07.08.2002 | ||
Former [2004/04] | AT | 07.11.2001 | |
BE | 07.11.2001 | ||
CH | 07.11.2001 | ||
FI | 07.11.2001 | ||
GR | 07.11.2001 | ||
LI | 07.11.2001 | ||
DK | 07.02.2002 | ||
PT | 07.02.2002 | ||
SE | 07.02.2002 | ||
ES | 30.05.2002 | ||
IE | 07.08.2002 | ||
Former [2003/46] | AT | 07.11.2001 | |
BE | 07.11.2001 | ||
CH | 07.11.2001 | ||
FI | 07.11.2001 | ||
GR | 07.11.2001 | ||
LI | 07.11.2001 | ||
DK | 07.02.2002 | ||
PT | 07.02.2002 | ||
SE | 07.02.2002 | ||
IE | 07.08.2002 | ||
Former [2003/42] | AT | 07.11.2001 | |
BE | 07.11.2001 | ||
CH | 07.11.2001 | ||
FI | 07.11.2001 | ||
GR | 07.11.2001 | ||
LI | 07.11.2001 | ||
PT | 07.02.2002 | ||
SE | 07.02.2002 | ||
IE | 07.08.2002 | ||
Former [2003/09] | AT | 07.11.2001 | |
BE | 07.11.2001 | ||
CH | 07.11.2001 | ||
FI | 07.11.2001 | ||
GR | 07.11.2001 | ||
LI | 07.11.2001 | ||
PT | 07.02.2002 | ||
SE | 07.02.2002 | ||
Former [2003/06] | BE | 07.11.2001 | |
CH | 07.11.2001 | ||
FI | 07.11.2001 | ||
GR | 07.11.2001 | ||
LI | 07.11.2001 | ||
PT | 07.02.2002 | ||
SE | 07.02.2002 | ||
Former [2003/01] | CH | 07.11.2001 | |
FI | 07.11.2001 | ||
GR | 07.11.2001 | ||
LI | 07.11.2001 | ||
PT | 07.02.2002 | ||
SE | 07.02.2002 | ||
Former [2002/49] | FI | 07.11.2001 | |
GR | 07.11.2001 | ||
PT | 07.02.2002 | ||
SE | 07.02.2002 | ||
Former [2002/48] | FI | 07.11.2001 | |
PT | 07.02.2002 | ||
SE | 07.02.2002 | ||
Former [2002/33] | FI | 07.11.2001 | |
SE | 07.02.2002 | ||
Former [2002/27] | SE | 07.02.2002 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH04143748 ; | [X]GB1204323 (ICI LTD [GB]) [X] 1,2,5,9 * page 1, line 43, paragraph 57 ** page 1, line 66 - line 71 *; | [X]US4710535 (PERROT PIERRE [FR], et al) [X] 1-4,6-12,14 * column 4, line 19 - line 24 * * example 1 *; | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 92, no. 26, Database accession no. 92-213928, XP002049495 & JPH04143748 A 19920518 (MITSUBISHI PAPER MILLS) [X] 1,2,5-9,12,14 * abstract * |