EP0825353 - Improved rivet assembly [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 16.04.1999 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.09.2002 | Loss of particular rights | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EMHART INC. Drummond Plaza Office Park, 1423, Kirkwood Highway Newark Delaware 19711 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1998/09] | For all designated states EMHART INC. Drummond Plaza Office Park, 1423, Kirkwood Highway Newark, Delaware 19711 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Smith, Daniel Robin 9 Woodford Avenue Castle Bromwich, Birmingham B36 9BG / GB | [1998/09] | Representative(s) | Dlugosz, Anthony Charles, et al Black & Decker Europe European Group Headquarters 210 Bath Road Slough Berkshire SL1 3YD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/05] | Dlugosz, Anthony Charles, et al Black & Decker Europe European Group Headquarters 210 Bath Road Slough, Berkshire SL1 3YD / GB | ||
Former [1998/09] | Stagg, Diana Christine, et al Emhart Patents Department Emhart International Ltd. 177 Walsall Road Birmingham B42 1BP / GB | Application number, filing date | 97306051.0 | 08.08.1997 | [1998/09] | Priority number, date | GB19960017453 | 17.08.1996 Original published format: GB 9617453 | [1998/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0825353 | Date: | 25.02.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/09] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0825353 | Date: | 20.05.1998 | [1998/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.04.1998 | Classification | IPC: | F16B31/04, H01R4/06, H01R4/26, F16B19/10 | [1998/21] | CPC: |
F16B19/1054 (EP);
H01R4/06 (EP);
H01R4/26 (EP);
F16B2200/93 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1998/09] | F16B19/10, H01R4/26, H01R4/06 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1999/05] |
Former [1998/09] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Blindnietanordnung | [1998/09] | English: | Improved rivet assembly | [1998/09] | French: | Ensemble de rivet aveugle | [1998/09] | Examination procedure | 12.10.1998 | Examination requested [1998/50] | 29.03.1999 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1999/22] | 30.03.1999 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 05.01.1999 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 05.01.1999 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 05.01.1999 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 05.01.1999 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 05.01.1999 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 05.01.1999 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 05.01.1999 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 05.01.1999 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 05.01.1999 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 05.01.1999 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 05.01.1999 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 05.01.1999 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 05.01.1999 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 05.01.1999 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US1759043 (DERBY NORMAN L) [A] 1,3* page 2, line 95 - line 109; figure 6 *; | [A]US3535673 (MALTAIS FREDERICK JEAN, et al) [A] 1-3 * column 4, line 38 - line 56; figures 1,17,21 *; | [DY]GB2017426 (TUCKER FASTENERS LTD) [DY] 1,2 * page 1, line 95 - page 2, line 38; figures 1-3 *; | [Y]DE3612501 (TUCKER GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1,2 * column 2, line 56 - column 3, line 5; figures 1-3 *; | [Y]DE9114473U (SIEMENS AG) [Y] 1,2 * column 2, line 36 - column 3, line 8; figures 1-3 *; | [Y]FR2697301 (SOCAPEX AMPHENOL [FR]) [Y] 1,2 * page 5, line 13 - line 29; figures 1-5 * |