EP0824859 - Display tank [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.08.2001 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.10.2001 [2001/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Boyd, Archibald Bellcairn Bungalow, Shore Road Cove G84 0NX Scotland / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/09] | For all designated states Boyd, Archibald Bellcairn Bungalow, Shore Road Cove G84 0NX, Scotland / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1998/09] | Representative(s) | Shanks, Andrew, et al Marks & Clerk LLP Aurora 120 Bothwell Street Glasgow G2 7JS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/09] | Shanks, Andrew, et al Cruikshank & Fairweather, 19 Royal Exchange Square Glasgow G1 3AE / GB | Application number, filing date | 97306302.7 | 19.08.1997 | [1998/09] | Priority number, date | GB19960017434 | 20.08.1996 Original published format: GB 9617434 | [1998/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0824859 | Date: | 25.02.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/09] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0824859 | Date: | 29.04.1998 | [1998/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0824859 | Date: | 18.10.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.03.1998 | Classification | IPC: | A01K63/00, A47F11/04, G09F13/12 | [1998/18] | CPC: |
A01K63/003 (EP);
A47F11/04 (EP);
G09F13/12 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1998/09] | A01K63/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1999/02] |
Former [1998/09] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Schaubehälter | [1998/09] | English: | Display tank | [1998/09] | French: | Récipient de présentation | [1998/09] | Examination procedure | 25.09.1998 | Examination requested [1998/48] | 30.10.1998 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 04.12.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.02.1999 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, LI, LU, MC, PT, SE | 09.04.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.07.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.09.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.12.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.04.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.07.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 14.07.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.07.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 27.11.1998 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 27.11.1998 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 27.11.1998 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 27.11.1998 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 27.11.1998 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 27.11.1998 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 27.11.1998 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 27.11.1998 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 27.11.1998 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 27.11.1998 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 27.11.1998 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 27.11.1998 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3610918 (BARLOW) [X] 1,4 * figure 6; claim 1 *; | [YA]GB2217964 (XIAO HU XU) [Y] 10 * the whole document * [A] 1,4,5; | [Y]US5000118 (MERRITT) [Y] 10 * column W *; | [AD]US3606299 (HENDGES) |