EP0825153 - Lithium-iron oxide particles and process for producing the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.10.2004 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2006 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TODA KOGYO CORPORATION 1-2, Funairi-minami 4-chome, Naka-ku Hiroshima-shi Hiroshima-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2001/20] | For all designated states Toda Kogyo Corporation 1-2, Funairi-minami 4-chome, Naka-ku Hiroshima-shi, Hiroshima-ken / JP | ||
Former [1998/09] | For all designated states TODA KOGYO CORP. 7-1 Yokogawa-Shinmachi Nishi-ku Hiroshima-shi Hiroshima-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nakamura, Tatsuya 3-4-32, Suzugadai, Inokuchi, Nishi-ku Hiroshima-shi, Hiroshima-ken / JP | 02 /
Kanno, Ryoji 5-534-718, Koyocho 5-chome, Higashinada-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP | 03 /
Takano, Mikio 17, Yasui-Higashiuramachi, Uzumasa, Ukyo-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto-fu / JP | [1998/09] | Representative(s) | Woods, Geoffrey Corlett J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/09] | Woods, Geoffrey Corlett J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 97306449.6 | 22.08.1997 | [1998/09] | Priority number, date | JP19960241145 | 23.08.1996 Original published format: JP 24114596 | JP19960241146 | 23.08.1996 Original published format: JP 24114696 | JP19960241147 | 23.08.1996 Original published format: JP 24114796 | [1998/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0825153 | Date: | 25.02.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0825153 | Date: | 26.11.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.12.1997 | Classification | IPC: | C01G49/00, C01G51/00, C01G53/00, H01M4/52 | [1998/09] | CPC: |
C01G51/42 (EP,US);
B82Y30/00 (EP,US);
C01G49/0027 (EP,US);
C01G49/0045 (EP,US);
C01G49/0072 (EP,US);
C01G49/009 (EP,US);
C01G53/42 (EP,US);
H01M4/485 (EP,US);
H01M4/505 (EP,US);
H01M4/525 (EP,US);
C01P2002/52 (EP,US);
C01P2002/54 (EP,US);
C01P2002/72 (EP,US);
C01P2004/62 (EP,US);
C01P2004/64 (EP,US);
C01P2006/40 (EP,US);
C01P2006/80 (EP,US);
H01M2004/028 (EP,US);
H01M6/162 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1998/45] |
Former [1998/09] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Lithiumeisenoxid und Verfahren zu seiner Herstellung | [1998/09] | English: | Lithium-iron oxide particles and process for producing the same | [1998/09] | French: | Oxyde de lithium et du fer et procédé pour sa préparation | [1998/09] | Examination procedure | 11.08.1998 | Examination requested [1998/41] | 06.12.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.06.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.02.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.08.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 08.08.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.08.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 26.11.2003 | NL | 26.11.2003 | GB | 22.08.2004 | [2006/14] |
Former [2005/46] | NL | 26.11.2003 | |
GB | 22.08.2004 | ||
Former [2004/33] | NL | 26.11.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2022012 (AMPEX) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0243926 (SONY CORP [JP]) [A] 1,10 * page 5 *; | [PX]EP0728702 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP], et al) [PX] 8-10 * claims 1-18 *; | [X] - RYOJI KANNO, "synthesis, structure and electrochemical properties of a new lithium iron oxide, lifeo2,with a corrugated layer structure", JOURNAL OF THE ELECTROCHEMICAL SOCIETY, (199608), vol. 143, no. 8, pages 2435 - 2443, XP002049328 [X] 8-10 * page 2435 * | [A] - FERNANDEZ-RODRIGUES, "synthesis and alteration of alpha-lifeo2", JOURNAL OF MATERIALS SCIENCE, (1988), vol. 23, pages 2971 - 2974, XP002049329 [A] 8 * page 2971 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF00547477 |