EP0832677 - Gas filter [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.08.2002 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.10.2002 [2002/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Andreae, Erhard Charles Rue de Lausanne 54 C 1110 Morges / CH | [1998/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1998/14] | Representative(s) | JENSEN & SON 366-368 Old Street London EC1V 9LT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/14] | JENSEN & SON 70 Paul Street London EC2A 4NA / GB | Application number, filing date | 97306786.1 | 02.09.1997 | [1998/14] | Priority number, date | GB19960020101 | 26.09.1996 Original published format: GB 9620101 | [1998/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0832677 | Date: | 01.04.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.01.1998 | Classification | IPC: | B01D45/16, B01D50/00 | [1998/14] | CPC: |
B01D45/08 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1998/14] | Extension states | AL | 01.10.1998 | LT | 01.10.1998 | LV | 01.10.1998 | SI | 01.10.1998 | Title | German: | Gasfilter | [1998/14] | English: | Gas filter | [1998/14] | French: | Filtre à gaz | [1998/14] | Examination procedure | 25.09.1998 | Examination requested [1998/48] | 03.04.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/42] | 14.05.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2002/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2001 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4354863 (OLESZAK JOHANN) [X] 1,3,5 * column 3, line 29 - column 4, line 14; figures 2-4; claims 1-3 *; | [A]WO9622824 (ANDREAE ERHARD CHARLES) [A] 1,3-5 * page 2 - page 3; figures 1-9 *; | [A]EP0394622 (ANDREAE ROBERT) [A] 1-5 * the whole document * |