EP0845429 - Automatic sheet feeding mechanism [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.05.2004 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 08.10.2008 [2008/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2001/13] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company, A Delaware Corporation 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US | ||
Former [1998/23] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto, California 94304 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Padget, Martin Jay 728 San Gabriel Place, No. 7 San Diego, CA 92109 / US | [2002/11] |
Former [1998/23] | 01 /
Padget, Martin Jay 17161 Alva Road, No. 215 San Diego, CA 92127 / US | Representative(s) | Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/41] | Carpmaels & Ransford One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | ||
Former [2002/30] | Carpmaels & Ransford 43 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | ||
Former [1998/23] | Colgan, Stephen James CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 97306868.7 | 04.09.1997 | [1998/23] | Priority number, date | US19960715683 | 18.09.1996 Original published format: US 715683 | [1998/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0845429 | Date: | 03.06.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0845429 | Date: | 09.07.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.01.1998 | Classification | IPC: | B65H3/06, B65H9/10 | [1998/23] | CPC: |
B65H3/0607 (EP,US);
B65H3/0638 (EP,US);
B65H3/34 (EP,US);
B65H3/5223 (EP,US);
B65H3/56 (EP,US);
B65H3/565 (EP,US);
B65H9/10 (EP,US);
B65H2301/4222 (EP,US);
B65H2404/121 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1999/08] |
Former [1998/23] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Automatischer Blattzufuhrmechanismus | [1998/23] | English: | Automatic sheet feeding mechanism | [1998/23] | French: | Mechanisme d'alimentation des feuilles | [1998/23] | Examination procedure | 17.07.1998 | Examination requested [1998/38] | 23.03.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.09.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.02.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.06.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.08.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.12.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.10.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.03.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 17.03.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP02075141.8 / EP1199268 | EP02075142.6 / EP1205412 | Opposition(s) | 14.04.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US5316285 (OLSON ALLAN G [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4-9 * the whole document * [A] 3,10-12; | [XA]US3601394 (LANG JOHN M, et al) [X] 1,2,4 * column W * [A] 3,5-12; | [A]US4541623 (HUERTA JOSE L [US]) [A] 1-12 * column W *; | [A]GB2126993 (XEROX CORP) [A] 1-12 * the whole document * |