EP0828182 - Storage-stable photoimageable compositions with improved leuco dye [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.09.2004 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.09.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.11.2004 [2004/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company 1007 Market Street Wilmington, DE 19898 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2003/47] | For all designated states E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY 1007 Market Street Wilmington Delaware 19898 / US | ||
Former [1998/11] | For all designated states E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY 1007 Market Street Wilmington Delaware 19898 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mooney, William Frank III 2 Eastwood Circle Sayre, Pennsylvania 18840 / US | 02 /
Patricia, Jeffrey J. 15 Woodside Road East Apalachin, New York 13732 / US | [1998/11] | Representative(s) | Towler, Philip Dean Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/11] | Towler, Philip Dean Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | Application number, filing date | 97306913.1 | 05.09.1997 | [1998/11] | Priority number, date | US19960711764 | 05.09.1996 Original published format: US 711764 | [1998/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0828182 | Date: | 11.03.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/11] | Type: | A1 / A2 RE Reissue of A-publication | No.: | EP0828182 | Date: | 08.07.1998 | [1998/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0828182 | Date: | 19.11.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.01.1998 | Classification | IPC: | G03C1/73 | [2003/21] | CPC: |
G03C1/732 (EP,US);
C09B11/04 (EP,US);
Y10S430/116 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1998/11] | G03C1/73, C09B69/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2003/47] |
Former [1998/48] | AT, BE, CH, DE, LI | ||
Former [1998/11] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Lichtbildfähige lagerstabile Zusammensetzungen mit verbesserten Leuko-Farbstoffen | [2003/21] | English: | Storage-stable photoimageable compositions with improved leuco dye | [1998/11] | French: | Compositions de formation d'image stables au stockage avec des colorants leuco améliorés | [1998/11] |
Former [1998/11] | Abbildbare lagerstabile Zusammensetzungen mit verbesserten Leuko-Farbstoffen | Examination procedure | 10.09.1998 | Examination requested [1998/45] | 12.09.1998 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 14.01.1999 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 17.10.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.04.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.05.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.09.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 19.09.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.08.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 03.11.1998 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 03.11.1998 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 03.11.1998 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 03.11.1998 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 03.11.1998 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 03.11.1998 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 03.11.1998 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 03.11.1998 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 03.11.1998 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 03.11.1998 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 03.11.1998 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 03.11.1998 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 03.11.1998 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]US3445234 (CESCON LAWRENCE ANTHONY, et al); | [A]US5059510 (JONES JR R SIDNEY [US], et al) [A] * column 4, line 65 - column 5, line 5 * | [DX] - E.S.LEWIS ET AL., "Rates and Isotope Effects in the Quinone Oxidation of Leuco Triphenylmethane Dyes", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY., DC US, (1970), vol. 92, pages 899 - 905, XP002049912 [DX] 19 * page 903 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja00707a027 |