EP0833333 - Disk package [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.04.2002 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.04.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.05.2002 [2002/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALPS ELECTRIC CO., LTD. 1-7 Yukigaya Otsuka-cho Ota-ku Tokyo 145 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1998/14] | For all designated states ALPS ELECTRIC CO., LTD. 1-7 Yukigaya Otsuka-cho Ota-ku Tokyo 145 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yamashita, Tatsumaro 4-3-39 Nishifunabasama, Shibata-cho Sibata-gun, Miyagi-ken / JP | 02 /
Abe, Kenji 4-1-201 Minamimedate, Miyagino-ku Sendai-shi, Miyagi-ken / JP | [1998/14] | Representative(s) | Kensett, John Hinton Saunders & Dolleymore LLP 9 Rickmansworth Road Watford WD18 0JU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/14] | Kensett, John Hinton Saunders & Dolleymore, 9 Rickmansworth Road Watford, Hertfordshire WD1 7HE / GB | Application number, filing date | 97307028.7 | 10.09.1997 | [1998/14] | Priority number, date | JP19960252890 | 25.09.1996 Original published format: JP 25289096 | [1998/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0833333 | Date: | 01.04.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0833333 | Date: | 30.05.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.12.1997 | Classification | IPC: | G11B23/03, G11B17/30 | [1998/14] | CPC: |
G11B23/0323 (EP,US);
G11B17/00 (KR);
G11B23/031 (EP,US);
G11B17/30 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1998/51] |
Former [1998/14] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Plattenmagazin | [1998/14] | English: | Disk package | [1998/14] | French: | Chargeur de disques | [1998/14] | Examination procedure | 29.01.1998 | Examination requested [1998/14] | 25.03.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.06.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.07.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.09.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.09.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 15.09.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.03.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0709840 (SONY ELECTRONICS INC [US]) [A] 1 * column 9, line 14 - column 10, line 42 * * column 13, line 10 - column 14, line 20 *; | [A]EP0712125 (IBM [US]) [A] 1 * column 7, line 7 - column 8, line 55; figures 3-10 *; | [A]EP0168107 (PHILIPS NV [NL]) [A] 1 * page 6, line 4 - page 8, line 32; figure 4 *; | [A]US4800554 (YAMASAKI HIDETOSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1 * column 7, line 9 - line 53; figures 19-23 * |