EP0828361 - Cellular CDMA data link utilizing multiplexed channels for data rate increase [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.04.2010 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.06.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 13.07.2011 [2011/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Corporation Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | [2002/11] |
Former [1998/11] | For all designated states NOKIA MOBILE PHONES LTD. Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Honkasalo, Zhi-Chun 2800, L. Don Dodson No. 1137 Bedford, Texas 76021 / US | 02 /
Noneman, John 13240 Betworth Road Valley Center, California 92082 / US | 03 /
Kahtava, Jussi 4505 W. Pioneer Drive No. 1014 Irving, Texas 75061 / US | 04 /
Laukkanen, Mika Tormatie 3 as. 2 90520 Oulu / FI | 05 /
Vadillo, Rodolfo 9 Burnham Manor, Gibbet Lane Camberley, Surrey GU15 3UP / GB | 06 /
Hottinen, Ari Ristiniementie 4 as. 30 02320 Espoo / FI | [1998/18] |
Former [1998/11] | 01 /
Honkasalo, Zhi-Chun 2800, L. Don Dodson No. 1137 Bedford, Texas 76021 / US | ||
02 /
Noneman, John 13240 Betworth Road Valley Center, California 92082 / US | |||
03 /
Kahtava, Jussi 4505 W. Pioneer Drive No. 1014 Irving, Texas 75061 / US | |||
04 /
Laukkanen, Mika Tormatie 3 as. 2 90520 Oulu / FI | |||
05 /
Vadillo, Rodolfo 5211 Marigot Place San Diego, California 92124 / US | |||
06 /
Hottinen, Ari Ristiniementie 4 as. 30 02320 Espoo / FI | Representative(s) | Read, Matthew Charles, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/49] | Read, Matthew Charles, et al Venner Shipley & Co. 20 Little Britain London EC1A 7DH / GB | ||
Former [1998/11] | Haws, Helen Louise Nokia Mobile Phones, St. George's Court, St. George's Road Camberley, Surrey GU15 3QZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 97307040.2 | 10.09.1997 | [1998/11] | Priority number, date | US19960711487 | 10.09.1996 Original published format: US 711487 | [1998/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0828361 | Date: | 11.03.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0828361 | Date: | 07.11.2001 | [2001/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0828361 | Date: | 27.05.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.09.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H04J13/04, H04B7/26, H04B1/707 | [2001/45] | CPC: |
H04J13/0048 (EP,US);
H04B1/707 (EP,US);
H04B7/264 (EP,US);
H04J13/0077 (EP,US);
H04W52/26 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1998/11] | H04J13/04, H04B7/26 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2002/30] |
Former [1998/11] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Zellulare CDMA Datenverbindung unter Verwendung von multiplexierten Kanälen zur Steigerung der Datenrate | [1998/11] | English: | Cellular CDMA data link utilizing multiplexed channels for data rate increase | [1998/11] | French: | Liaison cellulaire de données à AMDC utilisant des canaux multiplexés pour l'augmentation du débit des données | [1998/11] | Examination procedure | 13.04.2002 | Examination requested [2002/25] | 31.10.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.03.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.09.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M05) | 26.02.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.03.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.10.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.08.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.01.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.12.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.04.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 06.04.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.03.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 11.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 12.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 27.05.2009 | FR | 30.09.2009 | [2011/28] |
Former [2010/44] | FR | 30.09.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5442625 (GITLIN RICHARD DENNIS [US], et al) [X] 1-29 * column 3, line 7 - line 51; figure 2 *; | [X]WO9624206 (NOKIA MOBILE PHONES LTD [FI], et al) [X] 1,13,15,25,26 * page 10, line 18 - page 11, line 5 * * page 12, line 26 - line 28 * * page 19, line 22 - line 33; figures 1-8 *; | [X] - ZHU J ET AL, "PRINCIPLE AND PERFORMANCE OF VARIABLE RATE MULTI-CODE CDMA METHOD", 1995 FOURTH IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON UNIVERSAL PERSONAL COMMUNICATIONS RECORD. GATEWAY TO THE 21ST. CENTURY. TOKYO, NOV. 6 - 10, 1995, IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON UNIVERSAL PERSONAL COMMUNICATIONS, NEW YORK, IEEE, US, (19951106), vol. CONF. 4, ISBN 0-7803-2955-4, pages 256 - 259, XP000689951 [X] 1,13,15,25,26 * the whole document * | [X] - CHIH-LIN I ET AL, "PERFORMANCE OF MULTI-CODE CDMA WIRELESS PERSONAL COMMUNICATIONS NETWORKS", PROCEEDINGS OF THE VEHICULAR TECHNOLOGY CONFERENCE. CHICAGO, JULY 25 - 28, 1995, NEW YORK, IEEE, US, (19950725), vol. 2 CONF. 45, ISBN 0-7803-2743-8, pages 907 - 911, XP000551666 [X] 1,13,15,25,26 * the whole document * |